EP3242272 - IMAGE PROCESSING APPARATUS, IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.04.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.05.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.03.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.11.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.05.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 06.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [2017/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ishikawa, Tomokazu c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Tanaka, Wakako c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Suwa, Tetsuya c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Hori, Shinjiro c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [2020/24] |
Former [2017/45] | 01 /
Ishikawa, Tomokazu c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
02 /
Tanaka, Wakako c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | |||
03 /
Suwa, Tetsuya c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | |||
04 /
Hori, Shinjiro c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Representative(s) | WESER & Kollegen Patentanwälte PartmbB Radeckestraße 43 81245 München / DE | [2020/24] |
Former [2017/45] | WESER & Kollegen Radeckestraße 43 81245 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17000634.0 | 12.04.2017 | [2017/45] | Priority number, date | JP20160092798 | 02.05.2016 Original published format: JP 2016092798 | [2017/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3242272 | Date: | 08.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3242272 | Date: | 10.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06T7/77 | [2017/45] | CPC: |
G06T7/77 (EP,US);
H04N1/00045 (CN);
G06T7/0002 (US);
H04N1/4072 (CN);
G06T2207/10008 (US);
G06T2207/30168 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/25] |
Former [2017/45] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | BILDVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG, BILDVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN UND -PROGRAMM | [2017/45] | English: | IMAGE PROCESSING APPARATUS, IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD AND PROGRAM | [2017/45] | French: | APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGES, PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGES ET LOGICIEL DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGES | [2017/45] | Examination procedure | 12.04.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.05.2018 | Examination requested [2018/25] | 13.11.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.02.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 18.03.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.04.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 16.04.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.04.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 11.03.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.04.2017 | AL | 10.06.2020 | AT | 10.06.2020 | CY | 10.06.2020 | CZ | 10.06.2020 | DK | 10.06.2020 | EE | 10.06.2020 | ES | 10.06.2020 | FI | 10.06.2020 | HR | 10.06.2020 | IT | 10.06.2020 | LT | 10.06.2020 | LV | 10.06.2020 | MC | 10.06.2020 | MK | 10.06.2020 | MT | 10.06.2020 | NL | 10.06.2020 | PL | 10.06.2020 | RO | 10.06.2020 | RS | 10.06.2020 | SE | 10.06.2020 | SI | 10.06.2020 | SK | 10.06.2020 | SM | 10.06.2020 | BG | 10.09.2020 | NO | 10.09.2020 | GR | 11.09.2020 | IS | 10.10.2020 | PT | 12.10.2020 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 12.04.2017 | |
AL | 10.06.2020 | ||
AT | 10.06.2020 | ||
CY | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
ES | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
IT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
MC | 10.06.2020 | ||
MK | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SI | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 12.04.2017 | |
AL | 10.06.2020 | ||
AT | 10.06.2020 | ||
CY | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
ES | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
IT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
MC | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SI | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2023/27] | HU | 12.04.2017 | |
AL | 10.06.2020 | ||
AT | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
ES | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
IT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
MC | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SI | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 10.06.2020 | |
AT | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
ES | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
IT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
MC | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SI | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 10.06.2020 | |
AT | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
ES | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
IT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
MC | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SI | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AL | 10.06.2020 | |
AT | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
ES | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
IT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
MC | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SI | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 10.06.2020 | |
AT | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
ES | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
IT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SI | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/21] | AL | 10.06.2020 | |
AT | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
ES | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
IT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 10.06.2020 | |
AT | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
ES | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
IT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 10.06.2020 | |
AT | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
ES | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
IT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 10.06.2020 | |
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 10.06.2020 | |
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 10.06.2020 | |
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 10.06.2020 | |
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 10.06.2020 | |
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 10.06.2020 | |
NO | 10.09.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0849934 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * column 1, line 5 - column 3, line 47 * * column 7, line 16 - column 11, line 8 *; | [A]US2012278039 (PENG RENBIN [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0021] ** paragraph [0115] - paragraph [0125] *; | [XA] - BEYELER A ET AL, "The resonant retina: Exploiting vibration noise to optimally detect edges in an image", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON PATTERN ANALYSIS AND MACHINE INTELLIGENCE, IEEE COMPUTER SOCIETY, USA, (200309), vol. 25, no. 9, doi:10.1109/TPAMI.2003.1227982, ISSN 0162-8828, pages 1051 - 1062, XP011100732 [X] 1,6-9,14,15 * the whole document * [A] 2-5,10-13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TPAMI.2003.1227982 | [A] - CHOONWOO RYU ET AL, "Enhancement of feature extraction for low-quality fingerprint images using stochastic resonance", PATTERN RECOGNITION LETTERS., NL, (2011), vol. 32, no. 2, doi:10.1016/j.patrec.2010.09.008, ISSN 0167-8655, pages 107 - 113, XP055399343 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.patrec.2010.09.008 | [A] - MARAGATHAM G ET AL, "PSO-based stochastic resonance for automatic contrast enhancement of images", SIGNAL, IMAGE AND VIDEO PROCESSING, SPRINGER LONDON, LONDON, vol. 10, no. 1, doi:10.1007/S11760-014-0728-2, ISSN 1863-1703, (20141210), pages 207 - 214, (20141210), XP035948111 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11760-014-0728-2 | by applicant | JP2008009549 | JP2013135244 | - J.J.COLLINS; CARSON C.CHOW; THOMAS T.IMHOFF, "Stochastic resonance without tuning", NATURE, (UK, (19950720), vol. 376, pages 236 - 238 |