EP3407012 - CALIBRATION BODY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.05.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.05.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.05.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.04.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.12.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.07.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QS GRIMM GmbH Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 5 77656 Offenburg/Elgersweier / DE | [2018/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRIMM, Volker Auf der Rot 20 77716 Hofstetten / DE | [2018/48] | Representative(s) | Mertzlufft-Paufler, Cornelius, et al Maucher Jenkins Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Urachstraße 23 79102 Freiburg im Breisgau / DE | [2018/48] | Application number, filing date | 17000899.9 | 26.05.2017 | [2018/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3407012 | Date: | 28.11.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3407012 | Date: | 30.06.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G01B21/04, G01B1/00 | [2018/48] | CPC: |
G01B21/042 (EP);
G01B1/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/48] | Title | German: | KALIBRIERKÖRPER | [2018/48] | English: | CALIBRATION BODY | [2018/48] | French: | CORPS D'ÉTALONNAGE | [2018/48] | Examination procedure | 23.07.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.07.2018 | Examination requested [2018/48] | 23.07.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.12.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.04.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 16.04.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 16.04.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.05.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.05.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 31.03.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.05.2017 | AL | 30.06.2021 | CY | 30.06.2021 | CZ | 30.06.2021 | DK | 30.06.2021 | EE | 30.06.2021 | ES | 30.06.2021 | FI | 30.06.2021 | HR | 30.06.2021 | IT | 30.06.2021 | LT | 30.06.2021 | LV | 30.06.2021 | MC | 30.06.2021 | MK | 30.06.2021 | NL | 30.06.2021 | PL | 30.06.2021 | RO | 30.06.2021 | RS | 30.06.2021 | SE | 30.06.2021 | SI | 30.06.2021 | SK | 30.06.2021 | SM | 30.06.2021 | TR | 30.06.2021 | BG | 30.09.2021 | NO | 30.09.2021 | GR | 01.10.2021 | IS | 30.10.2021 | PT | 02.11.2021 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 26.05.2017 | |
AL | 30.06.2021 | ||
CY | 30.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
DK | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
ES | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
IT | 30.06.2021 | ||
LT | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
MC | 30.06.2021 | ||
MK | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SI | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 26.05.2017 | |
AL | 30.06.2021 | ||
CY | 30.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
DK | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
ES | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
IT | 30.06.2021 | ||
LT | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
MC | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SI | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 26.05.2017 | |
AL | 30.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
DK | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
ES | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
IT | 30.06.2021 | ||
LT | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
MC | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SI | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/19] | AL | 30.06.2021 | |
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
DK | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
ES | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
IT | 30.06.2021 | ||
LT | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
MC | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SI | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/06] | AL | 30.06.2021 | |
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
DK | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
ES | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
IT | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
MC | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SI | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 30.06.2021 | |
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
DK | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
ES | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
IT | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SI | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 30.06.2021 | |
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
DK | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
ES | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SI | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 30.06.2021 | |
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
DK | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
ES | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | CZ | 30.06.2021 | |
DK | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
ES | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | CZ | 30.06.2021 | |
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
ES | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | CZ | 30.06.2021 | |
ES | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | CZ | 30.06.2021 | |
ES | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | FI | 30.06.2021 | |
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | FI | 30.06.2021 | |
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | FI | 30.06.2021 | |
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | FI | 30.06.2021 | |
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | FI | 30.06.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US4364182 (JONES LYNN L) [X] 1-8 * column 3, line 40 - column 5, line 47; figures 2,3 * [I] 9-11; | [XA]US2004202364 (OTANI HITOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5 * paragraph [0098] - paragraph [0104]; figures 17,18 *[A] 3,6-11; | [XAI] - NAWARA L ET AL, "UBERPRUFUNG VON KOORDINATENMESSGERATEN MIT NORMALEN", TECHNISCHE RUNDSCHAU,, (19881007), vol. 80, no. 41, ISSN 1023-0823, pages 54 - 57, XP000022879 [X] 1-5 * Kapitel "Kalibrierung der Normalen";; figure 2 * [A] 6-8 [I] 9-11 |