EP3279120 - VEHICLE IMMOBILISATION DEVICE AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.04.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.05.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.01.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.12.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.10.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.08.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.04.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EXPRESSO France SAS Z.A. les Coteaux de la Mossig 6 rue Frédéric Bartholdi 67319 Wasselonne / FR | [2020/38] |
Former [2018/06] | For all designated states EXPRESSO France SAS ZA Les Côteaux de la Mossig 6 rue Frédéric Bertholdi 67319 Wasselonne / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Roere, Michel 1, Rue du Pont 67720 Weyersheim / FR | [2018/06] | Representative(s) | Munier, Laurent Cabinet Laurent Munier Avocat 18 rue de Stockholm 67000 Strasbourg / FR | [2018/06] | Application number, filing date | 17001316.3 | 01.08.2017 | [2018/06] | Priority number, date | FR20160001204 | 03.08.2016 Original published format: FR 1601204 | [2018/06] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3279120 | Date: | 07.02.2018 | Language: | FR | [2018/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3279120 | Date: | 08.06.2022 | Language: | FR | [2022/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B65G69/00, B61D45/00 | [2018/06] | CPC: |
B65G69/003 (EP);
B61D45/004 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/20] |
Former [2018/06] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | WEGFAHRSPERRVORRICHTUNG FÜR FAHRZEUG, UND IHR EINSATZ | [2018/06] | English: | VEHICLE IMMOBILISATION DEVICE AND USE THEREOF | [2018/06] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'IMMOBILISATION DE VÉHICULE ET UTILISATION | [2018/06] | Examination procedure | 01.08.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.04.2018 | Examination requested [2018/20] | 05.04.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.08.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.01.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.01.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 25.02.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 21.09.2021 | 21.09.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 30.12.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 30.12.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.01.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.03.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 10.03.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/20] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 01.02.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 01.02.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.03.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.08.2017 | AL | 08.06.2022 | AT | 08.06.2022 | CY | 08.06.2022 | DK | 08.06.2022 | EE | 08.06.2022 | FI | 08.06.2022 | HR | 08.06.2022 | LT | 08.06.2022 | LV | 08.06.2022 | MC | 08.06.2022 | MK | 08.06.2022 | MT | 08.06.2022 | RO | 08.06.2022 | RS | 08.06.2022 | SE | 08.06.2022 | SI | 08.06.2022 | SK | 08.06.2022 | SM | 08.06.2022 | TR | 08.06.2022 | IE | 01.08.2022 | BG | 08.09.2022 | NO | 08.09.2022 | GR | 09.09.2022 | IS | 08.10.2022 | PT | 10.10.2022 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 01.08.2017 | |
AL | 08.06.2022 | ||
AT | 08.06.2022 | ||
CY | 08.06.2022 | ||
DK | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
MC | 08.06.2022 | ||
MK | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SI | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
TR | 08.06.2022 | ||
IE | 01.08.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
IS | 08.10.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 01.08.2017 | |
AL | 08.06.2022 | ||
AT | 08.06.2022 | ||
CY | 08.06.2022 | ||
DK | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
MC | 08.06.2022 | ||
MK | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SI | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
IE | 01.08.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
IS | 08.10.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 01.08.2017 | |
AL | 08.06.2022 | ||
AT | 08.06.2022 | ||
CY | 08.06.2022 | ||
DK | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
MC | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SI | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
IE | 01.08.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
IS | 08.10.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 01.08.2017 | |
AL | 08.06.2022 | ||
AT | 08.06.2022 | ||
DK | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
MC | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SI | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
IE | 01.08.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
IS | 08.10.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AL | 08.06.2022 | |
AT | 08.06.2022 | ||
DK | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
MC | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SI | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
IE | 01.08.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
IS | 08.10.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 08.06.2022 | |
AT | 08.06.2022 | ||
DK | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
MC | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SI | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
IS | 08.10.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 08.06.2022 | |
AT | 08.06.2022 | ||
DK | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
MC | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
IS | 08.10.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 08.06.2022 | |
AT | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
MC | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
IS | 08.10.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/16] | AT | 08.06.2022 | |
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
MC | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
IS | 08.10.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | AT | 08.06.2022 | |
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
IS | 08.10.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 08.06.2022 | |
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 08.06.2022 | |
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | FI | 08.06.2022 | |
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | FI | 08.06.2022 | |
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | FI | 08.06.2022 | |
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US3164346 (BATESON NORMAN E) [X] 1,6,8 * columns 1-12; figures 1-20 * [Y] 7; | [X]US3180282 (GUTRIDGE JACK E, et al) [X] 1 * columns 1-14; figures 1-26 *; | [X]US3189307 (PETERSON WILLIAM H) [X] 1 * columns 1-16; figures 1-7 *; | [X]US5004386 (SCHMIDT KENNETH D [US], et al) [X] 1 * columns 1-10; figures 1-8 *; | [X]US6089544 (ELLIS ELWOOD BLAIR [CA]) [X] 1-5,9 * columns 1-10; figures 1-11 *; | [Y]EP2660170 (RITE HITE HOLDING CORP [US]) [Y] 7* figure 33 * |