EP3327917 - RECTIFIER AND ALTERNATOR USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.02.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Power Semiconductor Device, Ltd. 2-2 Omika-cho 5-chome Hitachi-shi, Ibaraki 319-1221 / JP | [2018/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tetsuya, Ishimaru c/o: Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, 1008280 / JP | 02 /
Mitsuhiro, Mori c/o: Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, 1008280 / JP | 03 /
Shinichi, Kurita c/o: Hitachi Power Semiconductor Device, Ltd. 2-2, Omika-cho 5-chome Hitachi-shi, Ibaraki, 319-1221 / JP | [2018/22] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [2018/22] | Application number, filing date | 17001694.3 | 12.10.2017 | [2018/22] | Priority number, date | JP20160229656 | 28.11.2016 Original published format: JP 2016229656 | [2018/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3327917 | Date: | 30.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H02M3/335, H02M7/219, H02J7/14 | [2018/22] | CPC: |
H02M3/33592 (EP,US);
H02M7/217 (CN,US);
H02H7/067 (US);
H01L29/00 (US);
H02J7/14 (EP,US);
H02M1/08 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/32] |
Former [2018/22] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GLEICHRICHTER UND GENERATOR MIT VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2018/22] | English: | RECTIFIER AND ALTERNATOR USING THE SAME | [2018/22] | French: | REDRESSEUR ET ALTERNATEUR L'UTILISANT | [2018/22] | Examination procedure | 12.10.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.11.2017 | Examination requested [2018/22] | 02.07.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2003095365 (NAKATAKE HIROSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0032]; figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE102009046955 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [Y]DE102015012585 (HITACHI POWER SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | JP2009524403 | JP2011507468 |