EP3473172 - APPARATUS FOR MEASURING OPTICAL PARAMETERS IN SCATTERING MEDIA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 04.10.2019 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 06.11.2019 [2019/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Universität Zürich Prorektorat VNW Rämistrasse 71 8006 Zürich / CH | [2019/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KLEISER, Stefan Gartenstrasse 22 79639 Grenzach-Wyhlen / DE | 02 /
Wolf, Martin Attenhoferstrasse 45 8032 Zürich / CH | 03 /
Ostojic Hürstringstrasse 13 8046 Zürich / CH | 04 /
NASSERI, Nassimsadat Affolternstrasse 115 8050 Zürich / CH | [2019/17] | Representative(s) | Mertzlufft-Paufler, Cornelius, et al Maucher Jenkins Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Urachstraße 23 79102 Freiburg im Breisgau / DE | [2019/17] | Application number, filing date | 17001733.9 | 20.10.2017 | [2019/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3473172 | Date: | 24.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/024, A61B5/1455 | [2019/17] | CPC: |
A61B5/14551 (EP);
A61B5/14552 (US);
A61B5/02427 (EP);
A61B2503/06 (EP);
A61B2562/0238 (US);
A61B2562/146 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR MESSUNG OPTISCHER PARAMETER IN STREUUNGSMEDIEN | [2019/17] | English: | APPARATUS FOR MEASURING OPTICAL PARAMETERS IN SCATTERING MEDIA | [2019/17] | French: | APPAREIL POUR MESURER DES PARAMÈTRES OPTIQUES DANS DES MILIEUX DISPERSIFS | [2019/17] | Examination procedure | 27.09.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/45] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4830014 (GOODMAN DAVID E [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6,7,9,10,14 * figures 7-9 *; | [X]US5109849 (GOODMAN DAVID E [US], et al) [X] 1,15 * figures 1,2,6-9 *; | [X]US5411024 (THOMAS SIMON W H [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * figure 7 *; | [X]US5779631 (CHANCE BRITTON [US]) [X] 1-13 * column 6, lines 46,51; figures 2,5,6-8,14,15 * * column 10, line 63 * * column 13, line 34 * * column 14, lines 2,12,21,28,43 * * column 15, line 62 * * column 16, lines 10,20 *; | [X]WO2005010567 (TITAN CORP [US], et al) [X] 1 * figures 5,7 *; | [A]US2006241502 (CHANCE BRITTON [US]) [A] 1,5 * figure 4a *; | [X]US2009171177 (HANNULA DON L [US], et al) [X] 1 * figure 1 *; | [X]WO2010111127 (NELLCOR PURITAN BENNETT LLC [US], et al) [X] 1 * figures 2,3,5 *; | [A]US2013060259 (PORAT GADI [IL]) [A] 1* paragraph [0092]; figure 3 *; | [A]US8460197 (BRADY DONALD [US], et al) [A] 1 * figures 10,11 * | by applicant | US5661302 | US6078833 | US8055321 |