EP3328046 - VISUAL TELEPHONY APPARATUS, SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.04.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.05.2019 [2019/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stocker, Loren PO Box 2004 Del Mar, CA 92014 / US | [2018/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2018/22] | Representative(s) | Schmidt, Steffen J. Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/22] | Schmidt, Steffen J. Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17001893.1 | 04.04.2012 | [2018/22] | Priority number, date | US201161516664P | 05.04.2011 Original published format: US 201161516664 P | [2018/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3328046 | Date: | 30.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04M11/00, H04M3/42 | [2018/22] | CPC: |
H04M7/0024 (EP,US);
H04M3/42042 (EP,US);
H04M3/42093 (EP,US);
H04M3/567 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/22] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG, SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN FÜR VISUELLE TELEFONIE | [2018/22] | English: | VISUAL TELEPHONY APPARATUS, SYSTEM AND METHOD | [2018/22] | French: | APPAREIL, SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE TÉLÉPHONIE VISUELLE | [2018/22] | Examination procedure | 01.12.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/21] | 09.01.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2019/21] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP12768232.6 / EP2695368 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004062230 (TAYLOR RICHARD C [CA], et al) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0006] *; | [A]EP1593021 (CONVOQ INC [US]) [A] 1-12 * abstract *; | [A]US2010073453 (VELARDE JIMENA [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0032] *; | [A]US2004121814 (CREAMER THOMAS E [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0016] , [0018] , [0028] , [0030] * | by applicant | US8036355 |