EP3492435 - METHOD FOR VINASSE WASTE TREATMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.05.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dergo Spólka z ograniczona odpowiedzialnoscia Aleja Marszalka Jozefa Pilsudskiego 141 92-318 Lodz / PL | [2019/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STOCHMAL, Agnieszka ul. Tczewskiej 83c/1 83-112 Lubiszewo / PL | 02 /
DZIUGAN, Piotr Ul. Grudzinska 7m 95-100 Zgierz / PL | [2019/23] | Application number, filing date | 17001975.6 | 04.12.2017 | [2019/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3492435 | Date: | 05.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C02F11/04, C02F3/28, C02F3/12, C02F1/52, C02F1/72, // C02F103/26, C02F103/32 | [2019/23] | CPC: |
C02F11/04 (EP);
C02F1/5245 (EP);
C02F1/5254 (EP);
C02F1/722 (EP);
C02F3/12 (EP);
C02F3/286 (EP);
C02F2103/26 (EP);
C02F2103/32 (EP);
C02F2103/325 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON VINASSE | [2019/23] | English: | METHOD FOR VINASSE WASTE TREATMENT | [2019/23] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE VINASSE | [2019/23] | Examination procedure | 06.12.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/33] | 21.02.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/33] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2019 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]EP1790732 (PROKOP INVEST A S [CZ], et al) [I] 1,2 * paragraphs [0005] , [0011] - [0017] * [Y] 1,2; | [Y] - RODRIGUES CARMEN S D ET AL, "Combination of chemical coagulation, photo-Fenton oxidation and biodegradation for the treatment of vinasse from sugar cane ethanol distillery", JOURNAL OF CLEANER PRODUCTION, (20161021), vol. 142, doi:10.1016/J.JCLEPRO.2016.10.104, ISSN 0959-6526, pages 3634 - 3644, XP029852002 [Y] 1,2 * abstract * * page 3635, column 1, lines 20-24 * * page 3635, column 2, lines 10-12, 48-56 * * chapter 2.2.1.; page 3635, column 1, line 61 - column 2, line 8 * * page 3636, column 1, line 53 - column 2, line 13 * * Approach 3; page 3640 - page 3642 * * chapter 2.2.2.; page 3636 * * page 3636, column 1, lines 1-5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jclepro.2016.10.104 | by applicant | US5328707 | GB1470331 | PL208046 | RU2220195 |