EP3272654 - REMOVING WATER FROM FUEL TANKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.12.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.01.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.10.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.09.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.07.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Airbus Operations Limited Pegasus House Aerospace Avenue Filton Bristol BS34 7PA / GB | [2020/08] |
Former [2018/04] | For all designated states Airbus Operations Limited Pegasus House Aerospace Avenue Filton Bristol BS34 7PA / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wheelwright, Jay c/o Airbus Operations Ltd UK IP Department Pegasus House Aerospace Avenue Filton, Bristol BS34 7PA / GB | 02 /
Dobbs, Jacob c/o Airbus Operations Ltd. UK IP Department Pegasus House Aerospace Avenue Filton, Bristol BS34 7PA / GB | 03 /
Martin, Christian c/o Airbus Operations Ltd. UK IP Department Pegasus House Aerospace Avenue Filton, Bristol BS34 7PA / GB | [2018/04] | Representative(s) | Ribeiro, James Michael Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/08] | Ribeiro, James Michael Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | Application number, filing date | 17020313.7 | 19.07.2017 | [2018/04] | Priority number, date | GB20160012584 | 20.07.2016 Original published format: GB 201612584 | [2018/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3272654 | Date: | 24.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3272654 | Date: | 19.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B64D37/28 | [2018/04] | CPC: |
B64D37/28 (EP,GB,US);
B01D69/10 (EP,GB,US);
B01D35/005 (GB);
B01D36/003 (US);
B60K15/03 (GB);
B60K15/03006 (US);
B64D37/005 (GB);
B64D37/32 (GB);
C10G33/06 (EP,US);
F02M37/24 (EP,GB,US);
F02M37/50 (EP,US);
B01D2257/80 (US);
B60K2015/03236 (US);
B60K2015/03256 (GB);
B60K2015/03276 (US);
B64D37/02 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/33] |
Former [2018/04] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | BESEITIGUNG VON WASSER AUS KRAFTSTOFFTANKS | [2018/04] | English: | REMOVING WATER FROM FUEL TANKS | [2018/04] | French: | ÉLIMINER L'EAU DE RÉSERVOIRS DE CARBURANT | [2018/04] | Examination procedure | 19.07.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.07.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.07.2018 | Examination requested [2018/33] | 10.09.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.08.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.01.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 06.01.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.01.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 20.11.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.07.2017 | AL | 19.02.2020 | AT | 19.02.2020 | CY | 19.02.2020 | CZ | 19.02.2020 | DK | 19.02.2020 | EE | 19.02.2020 | FI | 19.02.2020 | HR | 19.02.2020 | LT | 19.02.2020 | LV | 19.02.2020 | MC | 19.02.2020 | MK | 19.02.2020 | MT | 19.02.2020 | NL | 19.02.2020 | PL | 19.02.2020 | RO | 19.02.2020 | RS | 19.02.2020 | SE | 19.02.2020 | SI | 19.02.2020 | SK | 19.02.2020 | SM | 19.02.2020 | TR | 19.02.2020 | BG | 19.05.2020 | NO | 19.05.2020 | GR | 20.05.2020 | IS | 19.06.2020 | PT | 12.07.2020 | IE | 19.07.2020 | LU | 19.07.2020 | ES | 20.07.2020 | BE | 31.07.2020 | CH | 31.07.2020 | LI | 31.07.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 19.07.2017 | |
AL | 19.02.2020 | ||
AT | 19.02.2020 | ||
CY | 19.02.2020 | ||
CZ | 19.02.2020 | ||
DK | 19.02.2020 | ||
EE | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
MC | 19.02.2020 | ||
MT | 19.02.2020 | ||
NL | 19.02.2020 | ||
PL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
SI | 19.02.2020 | ||
SK | 19.02.2020 | ||
SM | 19.02.2020 | ||
TR | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
PT | 12.07.2020 | ||
IE | 19.07.2020 | ||
LU | 19.07.2020 | ||
ES | 20.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 19.07.2017 | |
AT | 19.02.2020 | ||
CY | 19.02.2020 | ||
CZ | 19.02.2020 | ||
DK | 19.02.2020 | ||
EE | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
MC | 19.02.2020 | ||
MT | 19.02.2020 | ||
NL | 19.02.2020 | ||
PL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
SI | 19.02.2020 | ||
SK | 19.02.2020 | ||
SM | 19.02.2020 | ||
TR | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
PT | 12.07.2020 | ||
IE | 19.07.2020 | ||
LU | 19.07.2020 | ||
ES | 20.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 19.02.2020 | |
CZ | 19.02.2020 | ||
DK | 19.02.2020 | ||
EE | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
MC | 19.02.2020 | ||
NL | 19.02.2020 | ||
PL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
SI | 19.02.2020 | ||
SK | 19.02.2020 | ||
SM | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
PT | 12.07.2020 | ||
IE | 19.07.2020 | ||
LU | 19.07.2020 | ||
ES | 20.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 19.02.2020 | |
CZ | 19.02.2020 | ||
DK | 19.02.2020 | ||
EE | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
MC | 19.02.2020 | ||
NL | 19.02.2020 | ||
PL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
SI | 19.02.2020 | ||
SK | 19.02.2020 | ||
SM | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
PT | 12.07.2020 | ||
IE | 19.07.2020 | ||
LU | 19.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AT | 19.02.2020 | |
CZ | 19.02.2020 | ||
DK | 19.02.2020 | ||
EE | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
MC | 19.02.2020 | ||
NL | 19.02.2020 | ||
PL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
SI | 19.02.2020 | ||
SK | 19.02.2020 | ||
SM | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
PT | 12.07.2020 | ||
LU | 19.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 19.02.2020 | |
CZ | 19.02.2020 | ||
DK | 19.02.2020 | ||
EE | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
MC | 19.02.2020 | ||
NL | 19.02.2020 | ||
PL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
SI | 19.02.2020 | ||
SK | 19.02.2020 | ||
SM | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
PT | 12.07.2020 | ||
LU | 19.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/13] | AT | 19.02.2020 | |
CZ | 19.02.2020 | ||
DK | 19.02.2020 | ||
EE | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
MC | 19.02.2020 | ||
NL | 19.02.2020 | ||
PL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
SI | 19.02.2020 | ||
SK | 19.02.2020 | ||
SM | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
PT | 12.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/11] | AT | 19.02.2020 | |
CZ | 19.02.2020 | ||
DK | 19.02.2020 | ||
EE | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
NL | 19.02.2020 | ||
PL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
SI | 19.02.2020 | ||
SK | 19.02.2020 | ||
SM | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
PT | 12.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 19.02.2020 | |
DK | 19.02.2020 | ||
EE | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
NL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
SK | 19.02.2020 | ||
SM | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
PT | 12.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 19.02.2020 | |
DK | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
NL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
SK | 19.02.2020 | ||
SM | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
PT | 12.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | DK | 19.02.2020 | |
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
NL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
SM | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
PT | 12.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | DK | 19.02.2020 | |
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
NL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/45] | FI | 19.02.2020 | |
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
NL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | FI | 19.02.2020 | |
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 19.02.2020 | |
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 19.02.2020 | |
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 19.02.2020 | |
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 19.02.2020 | |
NO | 19.05.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US3322280 (WILFRED TAYLOR); | [XAI]US5606989 (ROLL MARK A [US], et al); | [XI]WO2006072545 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) |