Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP3190747 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3190747



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 511
18.09.2019 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
18.07.2019 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
26.11.2018 Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC Search / examination 1
18.10.2018 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
25.09.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
25.09.2018 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
25.09.2018 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
25.09.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
28.06.2018 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
21.06.2018 Submission concerning change of applicant's address Search / examination 1
06.06.2018 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
06.06.2018 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
06.06.2018 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
06.06.2018 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 74
06.06.2018 Text intended for grant (version for approval) Search / examination 74
23.05.2018 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
17.05.2018 Examination started Search / examination 1
03.05.2018 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
25.04.2018 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Search / examination 12
08.01.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
08.01.2018 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
08.01.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
08.01.2018 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
08.01.2018 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 5
08.01.2018 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
08.01.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
25.10.2017 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
20.10.2017 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Search / examination 20
17.07.2017 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
14.06.2017 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
27.04.2017 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 4
06.04.2017 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
06.04.2017 European search opinion Search / examination 5
06.04.2017 European search report Search / examination 2
06.04.2017 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
28.03.2017 Search started Search / examination 1
09.03.2017 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
08.03.2017 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
03.03.2017 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 87
03.03.2017 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 80
24.02.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
24.02.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
24.02.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
24.02.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
24.02.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
03.01.2017 Abstract Search / examination 1
03.01.2017 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
03.01.2017 Claims Search / examination 4
03.01.2017 Description Search / examination 55
03.01.2017 Designation of inventor Search / examination 2
03.01.2017 Drawings Search / examination 16
03.01.2017 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5