EP3193189 - POSITIONING SENSOR AND DIRECTION ESTIMATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.08.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.06.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.12.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2017/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HONMA, Naoki c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
SASAKAWA, Dai c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2017/29] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2017/29] | Application number, filing date | 17150142.2 | 03.01.2017 | [2017/29] | Priority number, date | JP20160006651 | 15.01.2016 Original published format: JP 2016006651 | JP20160112251 | 03.06.2016 Original published format: JP 2016112251 | [2017/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3193189 | Date: | 19.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3193189 | Date: | 06.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G01S7/41, G01S13/00, G01S13/42, G01S13/88 | [2017/29] | CPC: |
G01S13/42 (EP,US);
G01S13/003 (EP,US);
G01S13/46 (US);
G01S13/88 (EP,US);
G01S7/354 (US);
G01S7/415 (EP,US);
G01S2013/468 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/04] |
Former [2017/29] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | POSITIONSSENSOR UND RICHTUNGSSCHÄTZVERFAHREN | [2017/29] | English: | POSITIONING SENSOR AND DIRECTION ESTIMATION METHOD | [2017/29] | French: | CAPTEUR DE POSITIONNEMENT ET PROCÉDÉ D'ESTIMATION DE DIRECTION | [2017/29] | Examination procedure | 03.01.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.12.2017 | Examination requested [2018/04] | 25.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.12.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.07.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 05.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 06.03.2024 | ES | 06.03.2024 | FI | 06.03.2024 | HR | 06.03.2024 | LT | 06.03.2024 | LV | 06.03.2024 | NL | 06.03.2024 | SE | 06.03.2024 | NO | 06.06.2024 | RS | 06.06.2024 | GR | 07.06.2024 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/37] | BG | 06.03.2024 | |
ES | 06.03.2024 | ||
FI | 06.03.2024 | ||
HR | 06.03.2024 | ||
LT | 06.03.2024 | ||
LV | 06.03.2024 | ||
SE | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.06.2024 | ||
RS | 06.06.2024 | ||
GR | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/36] | BG | 06.03.2024 | |
ES | 06.03.2024 | ||
FI | 06.03.2024 | ||
HR | 06.03.2024 | ||
LT | 06.03.2024 | ||
LV | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.06.2024 | ||
RS | 06.06.2024 | ||
GR | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | BG | 06.03.2024 | |
ES | 06.03.2024 | ||
FI | 06.03.2024 | ||
HR | 06.03.2024 | ||
LT | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.06.2024 | ||
RS | 06.06.2024 | ||
GR | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 06.03.2024 | |
FI | 06.03.2024 | ||
HR | 06.03.2024 | ||
LT | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.06.2024 | ||
RS | 06.06.2024 | ||
GR | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 06.03.2024 | |
NO | 06.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2010207804 (HAYWARD STEPHEN DAVID [GB], et al) [X] 1-14 * paragraphs [0001] , [00 2] * * paragraphs [0006] - [0028] * * paragraphs [0031] - [0055] * * paragraphs [0068] - [0093] *; | [XD]JP2015117961 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD, et al) [XD] 1-14 * paragraphs [0027] - [0096] *; | [A]WO2015102713 (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US]) [A] 1-14* the whole document * | by applicant | WO2012115220 | JP2014512526 | WO2014141519 | JP2014215200 | JP2015072173 | JP2015117972 | JP2015117961 | JP2015119770 | - DAI SASAKAWA; KEITA KONNO; NAOKI HONMA; KENTARO NISHIMORI; NOBUYASU TAKEMURA; TSUTOMU MITSUI, "Fast Estimation Algorithm for Living Body Radar", INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON ANTENNAS AND PROPAGATION (ISAP 2014, (201412), pages 583 - 584 | JP20130558810 |