EP3346517 - BATTERY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.01.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.01.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung SDI Co., Ltd 150-20, Gongse-ro Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 17084 / KR | [2018/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WÜNSCHE, Ralph Kastellfeldgasse 50 8010 Graz / AT | 02 /
STOJANOVIC, Oliver - deceased / AT | 03 /
KRIEGER, Horst Gündorf 23 8453 St. Johann i. S. / AT | 04 /
HOCHGATTERER, Nikolaus Harmsdorfgasse 34b/I 8010 Graz / AT | 05 /
AMREICH, Werner Steingasse 8A 8570 Voitsberg / AT | [2018/28] | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [2018/28] | Application number, filing date | 17150260.2 | 04.01.2017 | [2018/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3346517 | Date: | 11.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3346517 | Date: | 30.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/625, H01M50/209, H01M10/647, H01M10/6557, H01M50/249, H01M50/503, H01M10/613 | [2023/11] | CPC: |
B60K1/04 (EP,US);
H01M10/6556 (KR);
B60L50/64 (EP,US);
B60L50/60 (US);
B60L58/26 (EP);
H01M10/613 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/625 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/653 (US);
H01M10/6557 (EP,US);
H01M50/20 (KR);
H01M50/209 (EP,US);
H01M50/244 (US);
H01M50/249 (US);
H01M50/271 (EP,US);
B60K2001/0438 (EP,US);
H01M10/647 (EP);
H01M10/6567 (EP);
H01M2220/20 (KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/28] | H01M2/10, B60K1/04, B60L11/18, H01M10/625, H01M10/6557, H01M10/613 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/08] |
Former [2018/28] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | BATTERIESYSTEM | [2018/28] | English: | BATTERY SYSTEM | [2018/28] | French: | SYSTÈME DE BATTERIE | [2018/28] | Examination procedure | 09.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/08] | 09.01.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.05.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 20.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 30.08.2023 | DK | 30.08.2023 | EE | 30.08.2023 | ES | 30.08.2023 | FI | 30.08.2023 | HR | 30.08.2023 | IT | 30.08.2023 | LT | 30.08.2023 | LV | 30.08.2023 | NL | 30.08.2023 | RO | 30.08.2023 | RS | 30.08.2023 | SK | 30.08.2023 | SM | 30.08.2023 | NO | 30.11.2023 | GR | 01.12.2023 | IS | 30.12.2023 | PT | 02.01.2024 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 30.08.2023 | |
DK | 30.08.2023 | ||
EE | 30.08.2023 | ||
ES | 30.08.2023 | ||
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RO | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SK | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
PT | 02.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/22] | CZ | 30.08.2023 | |
DK | 30.08.2023 | ||
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RO | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 30.08.2023 | |
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/14] | FI | 30.08.2023 | |
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 30.08.2023 | |
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 30.08.2023 | |
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 30.08.2023 | |
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE102011107007 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [X] 1-11,13-15 * paragraphs [0006] - [0012] - [0 33] - [0048] - [0 53] - [0055]; figures 2,12 *; | [X]US2013266840 (FUJII RYO [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,5-7,10-15* paragraphs [0046] - [0065] - [0082]; figures 2,4 *; | [X]WO2015126209 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [X] 1-10,13-15 * figures 1,2,8,11 *; | [X]US2015270516 (MCLESKEY EDWARD PAUL [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-7,11,13-15 * paragraphs [0012] - [0020]; figures 3,4 *; | [E]US2017012330 (KIM JONGHOON [KR], et al) [E] 1-10,13-15 * paragraphs [0051] - [0053] - [0 57] - [0065] - [0 71] - [0073]; figures 1,2,8,11 * | Examination | EP3273500 |