EP3223107 - TEMPERATURE CONTROLLER, ELECTRONIC DEVICE HAVING THE SAME AND CONTROL METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.09.2018 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Arcadyan Technology Corporation 4F., No. 9, Yuanqu 2nd Road Science-Based Industrial Park Hsinchu City 300 / TW | [2017/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHEN, Yi-Hsiang 8F., No.8, Sec. 2, Guangfu Rd. East Dist. Hsinchu City 300 / TW | 02 /
HSIAO, Ho-Chieh 8F., No.8, Sec. 2, Guangfu Rd. East Dist. Hsinchu City 300 / TW | [2017/39] | Representative(s) | Lermer, Christoph Nove Haus - Design Offices Luise-Ullrich-Straße 14 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/39] | Lermer, Christoph LermerRaible Patent- u. Rechtsanwalts PartGmbB Lessingstrasse 6 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17151087.8 | 11.01.2017 | [2017/39] | Priority number, date | TW20160109469 | 25.03.2016 Original published format: TW 105109469 | [2017/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3223107 | Date: | 27.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3223107 | Date: | 25.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G05D23/19, F24F11/00 | [2017/39] | CPC: |
F24F11/33 (EP,US);
H05B1/02 (US);
F24D1/00 (US);
F24F11/30 (US);
F24F11/63 (EP,US);
F24H15/128 (EP,US);
F24H15/25 (EP,US);
F24H15/414 (EP,US);
G05D23/1931 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TEMPERATURSTEUERGERÄT, ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG DAMIT UND STEUERUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2017/39] | English: | TEMPERATURE CONTROLLER, ELECTRONIC DEVICE HAVING THE SAME AND CONTROL METHOD THEREOF | [2017/39] | French: | CONTRÔLEUR DE TEMPÉRATURE, DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE LE COMPRENANT ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE | [2017/39] | Examination procedure | 11.01.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.02.2017 | Examination requested [2017/39] | 26.04.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/43] | 04.06.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/43] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1837730 (SPHEROS GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-15 * Paragraphs [0001]-[0002], [0011], [0012], [0020], [0021]. Figure 1 *; | [A]US2008004065 (CHEN SHIH-YI [TW]) [A] 1-15* Paragraphs [0002], [0019]-[0021], [0030] Figures 1-2 *; | [Y]US2009216379 (SMITH MICHAEL [US]) [Y] 1-15 * Paragraphs [0006], [0011], [0026], [0028], [0029], [0035]-[0038] Figures 1-3 * |