EP3200120 - ENHANCED MATRIX SYMBOL ERROR CORRECTION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.2022 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.06.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.02.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.02.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hand Held Products, Inc. 9680 Old Bailes Road Fort Mill, SC 29707 / US | [2017/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ACKLEY, H. Sprague HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., Intellectual Property - Patent Services P.O. Box 377 115 Tabor Road, M/S 4D3 Morris Plains, NJ New Jersey 07950 / US | [2017/31] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Cheapside House 138 Cheapside London EC2V 6BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/30] | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Cheapside House 138 Cheapside London EC2V 6BJ / GB | ||
Former [2017/31] | Houghton, Mark Phillip Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell, Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 17151685.9 | 16.01.2017 | [2017/31] | Priority number, date | US201615006561 | 26.01.2016 Original published format: US201615006561 | [2017/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3200120 | Date: | 02.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3200120 | Date: | 28.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06K7/14 | [2017/31] | CPC: |
G06K7/1473 (EP,CN,US);
G06F11/10 (CN,US);
G06K7/14 (EP,US);
G06K7/1413 (CN);
G06K7/1417 (CN,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/31] | Title | German: | ERWEITERTES MATRIXSYMBOLFEHLERKORREKTURVERFAHREN | [2017/31] | English: | ENHANCED MATRIX SYMBOL ERROR CORRECTION METHOD | [2017/31] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE CORRECTION D'ERREURS DE SYMBOLE DE MATRICE AMÉLIORÉ | [2017/31] | Examination procedure | 16.01.2017 | Examination requested [2017/31] | 16.01.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.06.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 22.06.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 22.06.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP21186794.0 / EP3933662 | EP23220405.7 / EP4325394 | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.01.2017 | AL | 28.07.2021 | AT | 28.07.2021 | CY | 28.07.2021 | CZ | 28.07.2021 | DK | 28.07.2021 | EE | 28.07.2021 | ES | 28.07.2021 | FI | 28.07.2021 | HR | 28.07.2021 | IT | 28.07.2021 | LT | 28.07.2021 | LV | 28.07.2021 | MC | 28.07.2021 | MK | 28.07.2021 | MT | 28.07.2021 | NL | 28.07.2021 | PL | 28.07.2021 | RO | 28.07.2021 | RS | 28.07.2021 | SE | 28.07.2021 | SI | 28.07.2021 | SK | 28.07.2021 | SM | 28.07.2021 | BG | 28.10.2021 | NO | 28.10.2021 | GR | 29.10.2021 | IS | 28.11.2021 | PT | 29.11.2021 | IE | 16.01.2022 | LU | 16.01.2022 | BE | 31.01.2022 | CH | 31.01.2022 | LI | 31.01.2022 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 16.01.2017 | |
AL | 28.07.2021 | ||
AT | 28.07.2021 | ||
CY | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
IT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
MK | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
IE | 16.01.2022 | ||
LU | 16.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
CH | 31.01.2022 | ||
LI | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 16.01.2017 | |
AL | 28.07.2021 | ||
AT | 28.07.2021 | ||
CY | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
IT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
IE | 16.01.2022 | ||
LU | 16.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
CH | 31.01.2022 | ||
LI | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 16.01.2017 | |
AL | 28.07.2021 | ||
AT | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
IT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
IE | 16.01.2022 | ||
LU | 16.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
CH | 31.01.2022 | ||
LI | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AL | 28.07.2021 | |
AT | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
IT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
IE | 16.01.2022 | ||
LU | 16.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
CH | 31.01.2022 | ||
LI | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/03] | AL | 28.07.2021 | |
AT | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
IT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
LU | 16.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
CH | 31.01.2022 | ||
LI | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 28.07.2021 | |
AT | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
IT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
LU | 16.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AL | 28.07.2021 | |
AT | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
IT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
LU | 16.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | AL | 28.07.2021 | |
AT | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
IT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 28.07.2021 | |
AT | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
IT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 28.07.2021 | |
AT | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AT | 28.07.2021 | |
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 28.07.2021 | |
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 28.07.2021 | |
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 28.07.2021 | |
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 28.07.2021 | |
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 28.07.2021 | |
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 28.07.2021 | |
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6330972 (WIKLOF CHRISTOPHER A [US], et al); | [XAI]US2002041712 (ROUSTAEI ALEX [US], et al); | [A]US2009212111 (KRICHI MOSTAFA [FR], et al) | by applicant | US8548242 | US8616454 | US6832725 | US7128266 | US7159783 | US2008185432 | US7413127 | US2009134221 | US7726575 | US2010177080 | US2010177076 | US2010177707 | US2010177749 | US2010265880 | US2011202554 | US2012111946 | US2012168511 | US2012168512 | US2012193423 | US2012203647 | US2012223141 | US2012228382 | US2012248188 | US8294969 | US8317105 | US8322622 | US8366005 | US8371507 | US8376233 | US2013043312 | US8381979 | US8390909 | US8408464 | US8408468 | US8408469 | US2013082104 | US8424768 | US8448863 | US8457013 | US8459557 | US8469272 | US2013163789 | US8474712 | US2013173985 | US8479992 | US2013175341 | US2013175343 | US8490877 | US8517271 | US8523076 | US8528818 | US8544737 | US8548420 | US2013257744 | US2013257759 | US8550335 | US8550354 | US8550357 | US8556174 | US8556176 | US8556177 | US8559767 | US2013270346 | US8561895 | US8561903 | US8561905 | US8565107 | US8571307 | US2013287258 | US2013292475 | US2013292477 | US2013293539 | US2013293540 | US8579200 | US8583924 | US8584945 | US8587595 | US8587697 | US8588869 | US2013306728 | US2013306731 | US2013307964 | US2013308625 | US8590789 | US2013313324 | US2013313325 | US8599957 | US8596539 | US8596542 | US8596543 | US8599271 | US8600158 | US8600167 | US8602309 | US8608053 | US8608071 | US8611309 | US8615487 | US2013342717 | US8621123 | US2014001267 | US8622303 | US2014008439 | US8628013 | US8628015 | US8628016 | US8629926 | US8630491 | US2014019130 | US8635309 | US2014025584 | US8636200 | US8636212 | US8636215 | US8636224 | US8638806 | US8640958 | US8640960 | US8643717 | US2014034734 | US2014036848 | US2014039693 | US8646692 | US8646694 | US2014042814 | US2014049120 | US2014049635 | US8657200 | US8659397 | US2014061306 | US2014063289 | US2014066136 | US2014067692 | US8668149 | US2014070005 | US2014071840 | US2014074746 | US2014076974 | US2014078341 | US2014078345 | US8678285 | US8678286 | US8682077 | US8687282 | US8692927 | USD702237S | US2014097249 | US2014098792 | US2014100813 | US8695880 | US8698949 | US2014103115 | US2014104413 | US2014104414 | US2014104416 | US2014104451 | US2014106594 | US2014106725 | US2014108010 | US2014108402 | US2014110495 | US2014110485 | US2014114530 | US8717494 | US2014124577 | US2014124579 | US2014125842 | US2014125853 | US2014125999 | US2014129378 | US8720783 | US8723804 | US8723904 | US2014131438 | US2014131441 | US2014131443 | US2014131444 | US2014131445 | US2014131448 | US2014133379 | US2014136208 | US8727223 | US2014140585 | US8740082 | US8740085 | US2014151453 | US2014152882 | US8746563 | US8750445 | US2014158770 | US2014159869 | US8752766 | US8756059 | US2014166755 | US2014166759 | US2014168787 | US8757495 | US8760563 | US2014175165 | US2014175172 | US8763909 | US2014191644 | US2014191913 | US8777108 | US8777109 | US8779898 | US8781520 | US2014197238 | US2014197239 | US2014197304 | US8783573 | US8789757 | US8789758 | US8789759 | US2014214631 | US8794520 | US8794522 | US8794525 | US8794526 | US8798367 | US2014217166 | US2014217180 | US8807431 | US8807432 | US2014231500 | US2014232930 | US8820630 | US8822848 | US8824692 | US8824696 | US2014247315 | US2014263493 | US2014263645 | US2014267609 | US2014270196 | US2014270229 | US2014278387 | US2014278391 | US2014282210 | US8842849 | US2014284384 | US2014288933 | US8844822 | US8844823 | US8849019 | US2014297058 | US8851383 | US8854633 | US2014299665 | US8866963 | US8868421 | US8868519 | US8868802 | US8868803 | US2014312121 | US8870074 | USD716285S | US2014319220 | US2014319221 | US8879639 | US8880426 | US2014326787 | US8881983 | US8881987 | US2014332590 | US2014344943 | US2014346233 | US2014351317 | US8903172 | US2014353373 | US8908995 | US2014361073 | US2014361082 | US2014362184 | US2014363015 | US8910870 | US8910875 | US8914290 | US8914788 | US2014369511 | US8915439 | US8915444 | US8916789 | US8918250 | US8918564 | US2014374483 | US2014374485 | US2015001301 | US2015001304 | US2015003673 | US8925818 | US2015009338 | US2015009610 | US2015014416 | US2015021397 | US8939374 | US8942480 | US2015028102 | US2015028103 | US2015028104 | US2015029002 | US2015032709 | US8944313 | US8944327 | US8944332 | US2015039309 | US2015039878 | US8950678 | US2015040378 | US2015048168 | US2015049347 | US2015051992 | US2015053766 | US2015053768 | US2015053769 | US8967468 | US8971346 | USD723560S | US2015060544 | US2015062366 | US2015063215 | US2015063676 | US8976030 | US8976368 | US2015069130 | US2015071819 | US8978981 | US8978983 | US8978984 | US8985456 | US8985457 | US8985459 | US8985461 | US8988578 | US8988590 | US2015083800 | US2015086114 | US2015088522 | US8991704 | US8996194 | US8996384 | US9002641 | US2015096872 | US2015099557 | US2015100196 | US9007368 | US2015102109 | US9010641 | US9015513 | US9016576 | US2015115035 | US9022288 | US2015127791 | US2015128116 | US9030964 | US2015129659 | US2015133047 | US2015134470 | US9033240 | US9033242 | US9036054 | US9037344 | US2015136851 | US2015136854 | US2015142492 | US9038911 | US9038915 | USD730357S | US2015144692 | US2015144698 | US2015144701 | US2015149946 | US9047098 | US9047359 | US9047420 | US9047525 | US9047531 | USD730901S | USD730902S | US9053055 | US9053378 | US9053380 | US2015161429 | US9058526 | US2015169925 | US2015169929 | US9064165 | US9064167 | US9064168 | US9064254 | US9066032 | US2015178523 | US2015178534 | US2015178535 | US2015178536 | US2015178537 | US2015181093 | US2015181109 | US9070032 | USD733112S | USD734339S |