EP3203208 - METHOD FOR INSPECTING A CERAMIC COMPONENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.02.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.12.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 07.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aktiebolaget SKF 415 50 Göteborg / SE | [2021/17] |
Former [2017/32] | For all designated states Aktiebolaget SKF 41 550 Göteborg / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHOEPPL, Oskar Museumstraße 6 - 8 4020 Linz / AT | [2017/32] | Representative(s) | Kuhstrebe, Jochen, et al SKF GmbH Gunnar-Wester-Straße 12 97421 Schweinfurt / DE | [2023/33] |
Former [2017/32] | Burö, Sven Peter, et al SKF B.V. Kelvinbaan 16 3439 MT Nieuwegein / NL | Application number, filing date | 17151709.7 | 17.01.2017 | [2017/32] | Priority number, date | DE201610201647 | 03.02.2016 Original published format: DE102016201647 | [2017/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3203208 | Date: | 09.08.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3203208 | Date: | 18.10.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3203208 | Date: | 16.08.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G01N3/60, G01N33/38 | [2017/32] | CPC: |
G01N25/72 (EP,US);
C04B35/10 (US);
C04B35/48 (US);
C04B35/565 (US);
C04B35/584 (US);
C04B35/597 (US);
G01N21/8803 (US);
G01N3/60 (EP,US);
G01N33/388 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3217 (US);
C04B2235/3244 (US);
C04B2235/3826 (US);
C04B2235/3869 (US);
C04B2235/3873 (US);
C04B2235/9607 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/05] |
Former [2017/32] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR PRUEFUNG EINER KERAMISCHEN KOMPONENTE | [2017/32] | English: | METHOD FOR INSPECTING A CERAMIC COMPONENT | [2017/32] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE CONTRÔLE D'UN COMPOSANT EN CÉRAMIQUE | [2017/32] | Examination procedure | 17.01.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.12.2017 | Examination requested [2018/05] | 18.04.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.08.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 06.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 17.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 16.08.2023 | ES | 16.08.2023 | HR | 16.08.2023 | MC | 16.08.2023 | PL | 16.08.2023 | RO | 16.08.2023 | RS | 16.08.2023 | SK | 16.08.2023 | SM | 16.08.2023 | NO | 16.11.2023 | GR | 17.11.2023 | IS | 16.12.2023 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 16.08.2023 | |
ES | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RO | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SK | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HR | 16.08.2023 | |
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | HR | 16.08.2023 | |
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | NO | 16.11.2023 | |
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 16.11.2023 | |
GR | 17.11.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JPH0886731 (TOSHIBA CORP) [X] 1-4,6 * abstract * * paragraphs [0024] - [0063] *[I] 5; | [XP]WO2016023055 (MATERIALS CT LEOBEN FORSCHUNG GMBH [AT]) [XP] 1-4,6 * page 2, line 32 - page 5, line 7 * * page 7, lines 14-33; figure 1 * | Examination | - Anonymous, "Bruchzähigkeit - Wikipedia", (20200131), URL: https://de.wikipedia.org/wiki/Bruchzähigkeit, (20200131), XP055664006 | by applicant | DE102010017351 |