Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
24.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.02.2020 [2020/09] |
21.10.2019 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
10.05.2019 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
05.04.2019 | Change - classification | published on 08.05.2019 [2019/19] |
05.04.2019 | Change - classification | published on 08.05.2019 [2019/19] |
29.03.2019 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
02.02.2019 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
01.02.2019 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
05.09.2018 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
07.05.2018 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
27.04.2018 | First examination report | |
19.01.2018 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
19.01.2018 | Request for examination filed | published on 21.02.2018 [2018/08] |
19.01.2018 | Change - designated states | published on 21.02.2018 [2018/08] |
12.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant | |
16.06.2017 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 19.07.2017 [2017/29] |
18.01.2017 | Change - representative |