EP3351684 - METHOD FOR SETTING A ROAD SURFACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.03.2021 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.04.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.10.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.02.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For:AL
AT
BE
BG
CY
CZ
DE
EE
ES
FR
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
NL
PL
PT
RO
RS
SI
SK
SM
TR
Freilinger Beschichtungstechnik GmbH Mandlstraße 21 80802 München / DE | For:CH
DK
FI
GB
LI
NO
SE
Gallusberg Anstalt Schlossstrasse 50 9497 Triesenberg / LI | [2020/35] |
Former [2018/30] | For all designated states Freilinger Beschichtungstechnik GmbH Mandlstraße 21 80802 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Freilinger, Christian Donautalweg 10 4062 Kirchberg-Thening / AT | [2018/30] | Representative(s) | Burgstaller, Peter Rechtsanwalt Landstrasse 12 Arkade 4020 Linz / AT | [2018/30] | Application number, filing date | 17151961.4 | 18.01.2017 | [2018/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3351684 | Date: | 25.07.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3351684 | Date: | 06.05.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.2017 | Classification | IPC: | E01C7/14, E01C7/35 | [2018/30] | CPC: |
E01C7/142 (EP);
E01C7/147 (EP);
E01C7/351 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/10] |
Former [2018/30] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ERRICHTUNG EINES FAHRBAHNBELAGS | [2018/30] | English: | METHOD FOR SETTING A ROAD SURFACE | [2018/30] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UN REVÊTEMENT DE CHAUSSÉE | [2018/30] | Examination procedure | 24.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/10] | 24.01.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.02.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.02.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 17.10.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.02.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 25.02.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 25.02.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.02.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/15] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 12.03.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 12.03.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.03.2019 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2020 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   25.02.2020 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.01.2017 | AL | 06.05.2020 | CY | 06.05.2020 | CZ | 06.05.2020 | EE | 06.05.2020 | ES | 06.05.2020 | HR | 06.05.2020 | IT | 06.05.2020 | LT | 06.05.2020 | LV | 06.05.2020 | MC | 06.05.2020 | MK | 06.05.2020 | NL | 06.05.2020 | PL | 06.05.2020 | RO | 06.05.2020 | RS | 06.05.2020 | SI | 06.05.2020 | SK | 06.05.2020 | SM | 06.05.2020 | BG | 06.08.2020 | GR | 07.08.2020 | IS | 06.09.2020 | PT | 07.09.2020 | IE | 18.01.2021 | LU | 18.01.2021 | BE | 31.01.2021 | FR | 31.01.2021 | [2024/22] |
Former [2023/33] | HU | 18.01.2017 | |
AL | 06.05.2020 | ||
CY | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
IE | 18.01.2021 | ||
LU | 18.01.2021 | ||
BE | 31.01.2021 | ||
FR | 31.01.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
CY | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
IE | 18.01.2021 | ||
LU | 18.01.2021 | ||
BE | 31.01.2021 | ||
FR | 31.01.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
IE | 18.01.2021 | ||
LU | 18.01.2021 | ||
BE | 31.01.2021 | ||
FR | 31.01.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
IE | 18.01.2021 | ||
LU | 18.01.2021 | ||
FR | 31.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
LU | 18.01.2021 | ||
FR | 31.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/43] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
LU | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/40] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | HR | 06.05.2020 | |
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | HR | 06.05.2020 | |
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | HR | 06.05.2020 | |
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | LT | 06.05.2020 | |
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 06.05.2020 | |
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 06.09.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JPH02145469 (MITSUBISHI MINING & CEMENT CO, et al) [X] 1,2 * the whole document * [A] 3-8; | [E]AT517528 (FREILINGER BESCHICHTUNGSTECHNIK UG [DE]) [E] 1-8* the whole document *; | [IA] - Schomburg Gmbh, "Sicherheitsdatenblatt BETOCRETE-C16", (20160512), pages 1 - 7, URL: https://www.schomburg.com/de/de/dateien/betocrete-c16-7933a3b0-37f8-4107-8448-761c696e04d9/BETOCRETE-C16_(12)DE.pdf?dl=1, (20170629), XP055386410 [I] 1,2 * the whole document * [A] 3-8 | [IA] - Schomburg Gmbh, "BETOCRETE-C16, Betonzusatzmittel zur kristallinen Abdichtung, Technisches Merkblatt", (20160512), pages 1 - 2, URL: https://www.schomburg.com/de/de/dateien/betocrete-c16/TM BETOCRETE-C16_dt_3016.pdf?dl=1, (20170629), XP055386418 [I] 1-3 * the whole document * [A] 4-8 | by applicant | EP2292568 |