EP3199091 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR THE TREATMENT OF ENDOSCOPES AND ENDOSCOPE WASHING AND DISINFECTING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.02.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.03.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.01.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.02.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OLYMPUS Winter & Ibe GmbH Kuehnstrasse 61 22045 Hamburg / DE | [2017/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOPF, Oliver Düpenwisch 18 25421 Pinneberg / DE | 02 /
OTTENS, Benjamin Fuhlsbüttler Straße 466 22309 Hamburg / DE | 03 /
THATE, Henning Holitzberg 110 22417 Hamburg / DE | 04 /
WIERZOCH, Jan Buchenweg 2 25436 Tornesch / DE | [2017/31] | Representative(s) | Seemann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Raboisen 6 20095 Hamburg / DE | [2017/31] | Application number, filing date | 17152095.0 | 19.01.2017 | [2017/31] | Priority number, date | DE201610201284 | 28.01.2016 Original published format: DE102016201284 | [2017/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3199091 | Date: | 02.08.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3199091 | Date: | 07.04.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61B1/00, G01M3/26 | [2017/31] | CPC: |
G01M3/3272 (EP);
A61B1/00057 (EP);
A61B1/123 (EP);
A61B1/125 (EP);
G01M3/2846 (EP);
A61B1/015 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/11] |
Former [2017/31] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM AUFBEREITEN VON ENDOSKOPEN SOWIE REINIGUNGS- UND DESINFEKTIONSGERÄT FÜR ENDOSKOPE | [2017/31] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR THE TREATMENT OF ENDOSCOPES AND ENDOSCOPE WASHING AND DISINFECTING DEVICE | [2017/31] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT D'ENDOSCOPES ET APPAREIL DE NETTOYAGE ET DE DÉSINFECTION POUR ENDOSCOPE | [2017/31] | Examination procedure | 19.01.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/11] | 13.01.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.03.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 02.03.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.03.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.01.2017 | AL | 07.04.2021 | CY | 07.04.2021 | CZ | 07.04.2021 | DK | 07.04.2021 | EE | 07.04.2021 | ES | 07.04.2021 | FI | 07.04.2021 | HR | 07.04.2021 | IT | 07.04.2021 | LT | 07.04.2021 | LV | 07.04.2021 | MC | 07.04.2021 | MK | 07.04.2021 | MT | 07.04.2021 | NL | 07.04.2021 | PL | 07.04.2021 | RO | 07.04.2021 | RS | 07.04.2021 | SE | 07.04.2021 | SI | 07.04.2021 | SK | 07.04.2021 | SM | 07.04.2021 | TR | 07.04.2021 | BG | 07.07.2021 | NO | 07.07.2021 | GR | 08.07.2021 | IS | 07.08.2021 | PT | 09.08.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 19.01.2017 | |
AL | 07.04.2021 | ||
CY | 07.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
ES | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
MK | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SI | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
TR | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 19.01.2017 | |
AL | 07.04.2021 | ||
CY | 07.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
ES | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
MK | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SI | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 19.01.2017 | |
AL | 07.04.2021 | ||
CY | 07.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
ES | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SI | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 19.01.2017 | |
AL | 07.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
ES | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SI | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/39] | AL | 07.04.2021 | |
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
ES | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SI | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 07.04.2021 | |
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
ES | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SI | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 07.04.2021 | |
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
ES | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SI | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 07.04.2021 | |
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
ES | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | CZ | 07.04.2021 | |
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
ES | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | CZ | 07.04.2021 | |
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
ES | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | CZ | 07.04.2021 | |
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
ES | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | CZ | 07.04.2021 | |
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
ES | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | FI | 07.04.2021 | |
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | FI | 07.04.2021 | |
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | FI | 07.04.2021 | |
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | FI | 07.04.2021 | |
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | FI | 07.04.2021 | |
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | FI | 07.04.2021 | |
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | FI | 07.04.2021 | |
LT | 07.04.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2007238923 (KUBACH MELISSA [US]) [X] 1,2,4,6,7,9 * paragraphs [0010] , [0011] , [0019] , [0024] , [0088]; figures 1,3a,3b * [I] 3,8; | [A]US2001032494 (GRESZLER ALAN J [US]) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0066] , [0075] *; | [A]US2006252991 (KUBACH MELISSA [US]) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0020] , [0022] , [0024] , [0027] * | Examination | WO2016185929 | WO2016194449 |