EP3179252 - COVALENT TETHERING OF FUNCTIONAL GROUPS TO PROTEINS AND SUBSTRATES THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.09.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.10.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.05.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.12.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Promega Corporation 2800 Woods Hollow Road Madison, WI 53711 / US | [2017/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Darzins, Aldis Proteos, Inc. 4717 Campus Drive Kalamazoo, MI 49008 / US | 02 /
Encell, Lance P 5637 Kinsale Drive Fitchburg, WI 53711 / US | 03 /
Johnson, Tonny 3316 Country Grove Drive Madison, WI 53719 / US | 04 /
Klaubert, Dieter 250 Blue Sky Drive Arroyo Grande, CA 93420 / US | 05 /
Los, Georgyi V 3035 Hartwicke Drive Madison, WI 53711 / US | 06 /
McDougall, Mark 595 Heritage Lane Arroyo Grande, CA 93420 / US | 07 /
Wood, Keith V 8380 Swan Road Mt. Horeb, WI 53572 / US | 08 /
Wood, Monika G 8380 Swan Road Mt. Horeb, WI 53572 / US | 09 /
Zimprich, Chad 909 Virgin Lake Drive Stoughton, WI 53589 / US | [2017/24] | Representative(s) | Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/24] | Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | Application number, filing date | 17152698.1 | 29.07.2005 | [2017/24] | Priority number, date | US20040592499P | 30.07.2004 Original published format: US 592499 P | US20040006031 | 06.12.2004 Original published format: US 6031 | [2017/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3179252 | Date: | 14.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3179252 | Date: | 14.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/58, C12N9/14, C12Q1/34 | [2017/24] | CPC: |
C12Q1/34 (EP);
B82Y10/00 (EP);
B82Y30/00 (EP);
B82Y5/00 (EP);
C09B1/00 (EP);
C09B11/24 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/24] | Title | German: | KOVALENTES ANBINDEN VON FUNKTIONELLEN GRUPPEN AN PROTEINE UND SUBSTRATE DAFÜR | [2017/24] | English: | COVALENT TETHERING OF FUNCTIONAL GROUPS TO PROTEINS AND SUBSTRATES THEREFOR | [2017/24] | French: | FIXATION COVALENTE DE GROUPES FONCTIONNELS À DES PROTÉINES ET SUBSTRATS ASSOCIÉS | [2017/24] | Examination procedure | 23.01.2017 | Examination requested [2017/24] | 23.01.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.12.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.02.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.09.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 27.09.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.09.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05857556.4 / EP1782071 | EP11003760.3 / EP2395358 | Opposition(s) | 15.08.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 23.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 27.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.07.2005 | AT | 14.11.2018 | CY | 14.11.2018 | CZ | 14.11.2018 | DK | 14.11.2018 | EE | 14.11.2018 | ES | 14.11.2018 | FI | 14.11.2018 | IT | 14.11.2018 | LT | 14.11.2018 | LV | 14.11.2018 | MC | 14.11.2018 | NL | 14.11.2018 | PL | 14.11.2018 | RO | 14.11.2018 | SE | 14.11.2018 | SI | 14.11.2018 | SK | 14.11.2018 | TR | 14.11.2018 | BG | 14.02.2019 | GR | 15.02.2019 | IS | 14.03.2019 | PT | 14.03.2019 | IE | 29.07.2019 | LU | 29.07.2019 | BE | 31.07.2019 | CH | 31.07.2019 | LI | 31.07.2019 | [2021/32] |
Former [2021/26] | AT | 14.11.2018 | |
CY | 14.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SI | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
TR | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
IE | 29.07.2019 | ||
LU | 29.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AT | 14.11.2018 | |
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SI | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
TR | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
IE | 29.07.2019 | ||
LU | 29.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AT | 14.11.2018 | |
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SI | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
TR | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
LU | 29.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 14.11.2018 | |
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SI | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
TR | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AT | 14.11.2018 | |
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SI | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AT | 14.11.2018 | |
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SI | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AT | 14.11.2018 | |
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AT | 14.11.2018 | |
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AT | 14.11.2018 | |
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AT | 14.11.2018 | |
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 14.11.2018 | |
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 14.11.2018 | |
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 14.11.2018 | |
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 14.11.2018 | |
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 14.11.2018 | |
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 14.11.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]WO2004072232 (PROMEGA CORP [US], et al) [XP] 1 * Abstract; p. 106; example X; claim 47 *; | [A] - ANONYMOUS, "LECTURER ABSTRACTS", (20030530), INTERNET CITATION, URL: http://www.promega-rd.info/bioimage2003/abstracts/lecturer/default.asp, (20041019), XP002301487 [A] 1 * see "Site-specific localization of small molecule reporters within living cells" * | [A] - T. BOSMA ET AL, "Biodegradation of 1,2,3-Trichloropropane through Directed Evolution and Heterologous Expression of a Haloalkane Dehalogenase Gene", APPLIED AND ENVIRONMENTAL MICROBIOLOGY, (20020701), vol. 68, no. 7, doi:10.1128/AEM.68.7.3582-3587.2002, ISSN 0099-2240, pages 3582 - 3587, XP055027635 [A] 1 * Abstract. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/AEM.68.7.3582-3587.2002 | [T] - GEORGYI V. LOS ET AL, "HaloTag: A Novel Protein Labeling Technology for Cell Imaging and Protein Analysis", ACS CHEMICAL BIOLOGY, (20080601), vol. 3, no. 6, doi:10.1021/cb800025k, ISSN 1554-8929, pages 373 - 382, XP055027634 [T] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/cb800025k | by applicant | US4612302 | US4684620 | US4810636 | US4812409 | US4853371 | US5503977 | US6162931 | US6333154 | - NIELSEN, J.; JANDA, K.D., METHODS: A COMPANION TO METHODS IN ENZYMOLOGY, (1994), vol. 6, pages 361 - 371 | - DR. O. HERZBERG, UNIVERSITY OF MARYLAND BIOTECHNOLOGY INSTITUTE | - AMBLER ET AL., BIOCHEM. J., (1991), vol. 276, page 4710 | - ARSHADY ET AL., MACROMOL. CHEM., (1981), vol. 187, page 687 | - AUSUBEL ET AL., CURRENT PROTOCOLS IN MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, (1997), vol. III, A., no. 3-4, page 38 | - BLAUSTEIN; MILLER, NATURE, (2004), vol. 427, pages 499 - 500 | - BOSHART ET AL., CELL, (1985), vol. 41, page 521 | - BOSMA ET AL., APPL. ENVIRON. MICROBIAL., (2002), vol. 68, page 3582 | - BREITINGER; BECKER, CHEMBIOCHEM, (2002), vol. 3, page 1042 | - CORNISH-BOWDEN, Fundamentals of Enzyme Kinetics, PORTLAND PRESS LTD., LONDON, (1995), pages 1 - 17 | - CUBITT ET AL., TRENDS BIOCHEM. SCI., (1995), vol. 20, page 448 | - DANEN; YAMADA, J. CELL PHYSIOLOGY, (2001), vol. 189, page 1 | - DE ANGELIS ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1998), vol. 95, page 12312 | - Antibodies: A Laboratory Manual, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY PRESS, (1988), page 726 | - EU; ANDRADE, LUMINESCENCE, (2001), vol. 16, pages 57 - 63 | - FARINAS ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1999), vol. 274, page 7603 | - FRANKEN ET AL., EMBO J., (1991), vol. 10, page 1297 | - GARDINER-GARDEN ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1987), vol. 196, page 261 | - GORMAN ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI U S A, (1982), vol. 79, page 6777 | - GRIFFIN ET AL., SCIENCE, (1998), vol. 281, page 269 | - HATTA; TAKEICHI, NATURE, (1986), vol. 320, page 447 | - HATTA ET AL., J CELL BIOL., (1998), vol. 106, page 873 | - HISCOX ET AL., BBRC, (2002), vol. 293, page 714 | - HO ET AL., GENE, (1989), vol. 77, page 51 | - HOHESNESTER; ENGEL, MATRIX BIOLOGY, (2002), vol. 21, page 115 | - HOLLOWAY ET AL., J. MICROBIOL. METHODS, (1998), vol. 32, page 31 | - HYNKOVA ET AL., FEBS LETT., (1999), vol. 446, page 177 | - JANSSEN ET AL., EUR. J. BIOCHEM., (1988), vol. 171, page 67 | - JANSSEN ET AL., J. BACTERIOL., (1989), vol. 171, page 6791 | - JARVIK; TELMER, ANN. REV. GENET., (1998), vol. 32, pages 601 - 618 | - KEPPLER ET AL., NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2003), vol. 21, page 86 | - KEUNING ET AL., J. BACTERIOL., (1985), vol. 163, page 635 | - KIM ET AL., GENE, (1990), vol. 91, page 217 | - KINOSHITA; INOUE, CURR. OPIN. CHEM. BIOL., (2000), vol. 4, page 632 | - KNEEN ET AL., BIOPHYS. J., (1998), vol. 74, page 1591 | - KROOSHOF ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, (1997), vol. 36, page 9571 | - KULAKOVA ET AL., MICROBIOLOGY, (1997), vol. 143, page 109 | - KWON ET AL., ANAL. CHEM., (2004), vol. 76, page 5713 | - LLOPIS ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1998), vol. 95, page 6803 | - MEDOF; TYKOCINSKI, Glycobiology, NEW YORK: WILEY-LISS, (1990), pages 17 - 22 | - MIESENBOCK ET AL., NATURE, (1998), vol. 394, page 192 | - MINASOV ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (2002), vol. 124, page 5333 | - MIYAWAKI ET AL., NATURE, (1967), vol. 388, page 882 | - MIZUSHIMA; NAGATA, NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1990), vol. 18, page 5322 | - MURRAY ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1989), vol. 17, page 477 | - NAGATA ET AL., APPL. ENVIRON. MICROBIOL., (1997), vol. 63, page 3707 | - NAKAMURA ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS. RES., (2000), vol. 28, page 292 | - NEWMAN ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, (1999), vol. 38, page 16105 | - NOLLET ET AL., J MOL BIOL., (2000), vol. 299, page 551 | - ORMO ET AL., SCIENCE, (1996), vol. 273, page 1392 | - PIETERS ET AL., BIOORG. & MEDICINAL CHEM LETT., (1999), vol. 9, page 161 | - PRIES ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, (1994), vol. 33, page 1242 | - PRIES ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1995), vol. 270, page 10405 | - QURESHI ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2001), vol. 276, page 46422 | - RAGAUT ET AL., NAT. BIOTECHNOL., (1999), vol. 17, pages 1030 - 1032 | - ROSOMER ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1997), vol. 272, page 13270 | - SALLIS ET AL., J. GEN. MICROBIOL., (1990), vol. 136, page 115 | - SANGER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (1977), vol. 74, page 5463 | - SCHINDLER, BIOCHEMISTRY, (1999), vol. 38, page 5772 | - SCHOLTZ ET AL., J. BACTERIOL., (1987), vol. 169, page 5016 | - SEVELEVER ET AL., Paroxysmal Nocturnal Hemoglobinuria and the Glycophosphoinositol-Linked Proteins, SAN-DIEGO: CA: ACADEMIC PRESS, (2000), page 199 | - SIEGEL; ISACOFF, NEURON, (1997), vol. 19, page 735 | - SILVERMAN, "Mechanism-based enzyme in activation", METHODS ENZYMOLOGY, (1995), vol. 249, page 240 | - STEVENS, BIOCHEM. J., (1995), vol. 310, page 361 | - STROFFEKOVA ET AL., EUR. J. PHYSIOL., (2001), vol. 442, page 859 | - TAKEICHI ET AL., DEV BIOL., (1981), vol. 87, page 340 | - TIEDE ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1999), vol. 380, page 503 | - TSIEN, ANN. REV. BIOCHEM., (1998), vol. 67, page 509 | - UDENFRIEND; KODUKULA, METH. ENZYMOL., (1995), vol. 250, page 571 | - UETSUKI ET AL., J BIOL CHEM., (1989), vol. 264, page 5791 | - WADA ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1990), vol. 18, page 2367 | - YOKOTA ET AL., J. BACTERIOL., (1987), vol. 169, page 4049 | - ZAWADZKE ET AL., PROTEIN ENGINEERING, (1995), vol. 8, page 1275 | - ZLOKARNIK ET AL., SCIENCE, (1998), vol. 279, page 84 |