Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9709071 | Global Dossier | 18.07.2017 | B2 | US2013243634 | 19.09.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP10192467 | 24.11.2010 | WO2011EP70995 | 24.11.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9879695 | Global Dossier | 30.01.2018 | B2 | US2013243568 | 19.09.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP10192467 | 24.11.2010 | WO2011EP70996 | 24.11.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5988106B | Global Dossier | 07.09.2016 | B2 | JP2014502328 | 30.01.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | EP10192467 | 24.11.2010 | WO2011EP70995 | 24.11.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6028162B | Global Dossier | 16.11.2016 | B2 | JP2014500930 | 16.01.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | EP10192467 | 24.11.2010 | WO2011EP70996 | 24.11.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2643596 | Global Dossier | 12.07.2017 | B1 | EP2643596 | 02.10.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP11799082 | 24.11.2011 | EP10192467 | 24.11.2010 | WO2011EP70996 | 24.11.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2643595 | Global Dossier | 24.05.2017 | B1 | EP2643595 | 02.10.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP11796936 | 24.11.2011 | EP10192467 | 24.11.2010 | WO2011EP70995 | 24.11.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103339386B | Global Dossier | 29.03.2017 | B | CN103339386 | 02.10.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | EP10192467 | 24.11.2010 | WO2011EP70995 | 24.11.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103299085B | Global Dossier | 16.11.2016 | B | CN103299085 | 11.09.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | EP10192467 | 24.11.2010 | WO2011EP70996 | 24.11.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3179112 | Global Dossier | 05.08.2020 | B1 | EP3179112 | 14.06.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP11796936 | 24.11.2011 | EP10192467 | 24.11.2010 | WO2011EP70995 | 24.11.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2643595T | 18.09.2017 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP10192467 | 24.11.2010 | WO2011EP70995 | 24.11.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2643596T | 30.10.2017 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP10192467 | 24.11.2010 | WO2011EP70996 | 24.11.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK3179112T | 12.10.2020 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP11796936 | 24.11.2011 | EP10192467 | 24.11.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2559958 | 20.08.2015 | C2 | RU2013128532 | 27.12.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | EP10192467 | 24.11.2010 | WO2011EP70995 | 24.11.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2566865 | 27.10.2015 | C2 | RU2013128547 | 27.12.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | EP10192467 | 24.11.2010 | WO2011EP70996 | 24.11.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2012069619 | Global Dossier | 31.05.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP10192467 | 24.11.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2012069618 | Global Dossier | 31.05.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP10192467 | 24.11.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2458225 | Global Dossier | 30.05.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP10192467 | 24.11.2010 | Type | Earlier application | EP2643595 |