EP3179112 - PUMP COVER PLATE WITH THROUGH HOLES THAT ARE DESIGNED AS INERTIAL FILTERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.06.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.07.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.02.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.05.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 24.08.2022 [2022/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Frideco AG Gigering 27 8213 Neunkirch / CH | [2017/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CIRO, Robles Calle La Arboleda 135 Urb. Polo Hunt Monterrico Santiago de Surco Lima 33 / PE | 02 /
STÄHLE, Carl Gigeweg 10 8213 Neunkirch / CH | [2017/25] |
Former [2017/24] | 01 /
CIRO, Robles Bahnhofsstrasse 2 8213 Neunkirch / CH | ||
02 /
STÄHLE, Carl Gigeweg 10 8213 Neunkirch / CH | Representative(s) | Daub, Thomas Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Daub Bahnhofstrasse 5 88662 Überlingen / DE | [2017/24] | Application number, filing date | 17152843.3 | 24.11.2011 | [2017/24] | Priority number, date | EP20100192467 | 24.11.2010 Original published format: EP 10192467 | [2017/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3179112 | Date: | 14.06.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3179112 | Date: | 05.08.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F04D29/42, F04D29/70, F04D29/44, F04D7/04 | [2017/24] | CPC: |
F04D7/04 (EP,US);
F04D29/40 (US);
F04C2/16 (US);
F04D29/445 (EP,US);
F04D29/708 (EP,US);
F05D2250/15 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/52] |
Former [2017/24] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | PUMPENDECKPLATTE MIT DURCHBRECHUNGEN, DIE ALS TRÄGHEITSFILTER AUSGEBILDET SIND | [2017/24] | English: | PUMP COVER PLATE WITH THROUGH HOLES THAT ARE DESIGNED AS INERTIAL FILTERS | [2017/24] | French: | COUVERCLE DE POMPE AVEC TROUS FORMÉS COMME FILTRES INERTIELS | [2017/24] | Examination procedure | 24.01.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.01.2017 | Examination requested [2017/24] | 30.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.12.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 18.06.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.06.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP11796936.0 / EP2643595 | Opposition(s) | 07.05.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.11.2011 | AL | 05.08.2020 | CY | 05.08.2020 | CZ | 05.08.2020 | EE | 05.08.2020 | ES | 05.08.2020 | HR | 05.08.2020 | LT | 05.08.2020 | LV | 05.08.2020 | MC | 05.08.2020 | MK | 05.08.2020 | MT | 05.08.2020 | PL | 05.08.2020 | RO | 05.08.2020 | RS | 05.08.2020 | SI | 05.08.2020 | SK | 05.08.2020 | SM | 05.08.2020 | TR | 05.08.2020 | BG | 05.11.2020 | NO | 05.11.2020 | GR | 06.11.2020 | IE | 24.11.2020 | LU | 24.11.2020 | BE | 30.11.2020 | IS | 05.12.2020 | PT | 07.12.2020 | [2022/34] |
Former [2022/32] | HU | 24.11.2011 | |
AL | 05.08.2020 | ||
CY | 05.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
MC | 05.08.2020 | ||
MK | 05.08.2020 | ||
MT | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SI | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
TR | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IE | 24.11.2020 | ||
LU | 24.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 24.11.2011 | |
AL | 05.08.2020 | ||
CY | 05.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
MC | 05.08.2020 | ||
MT | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SI | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
TR | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IE | 24.11.2020 | ||
LU | 24.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AL | 05.08.2020 | |
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
MC | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SI | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IE | 24.11.2020 | ||
LU | 24.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 05.08.2020 | |
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
MC | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SI | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
LU | 24.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/33] | AL | 05.08.2020 | |
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
MC | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
LU | 24.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 05.08.2020 | |
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
MC | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 05.08.2020 | |
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 05.08.2020 | |
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | CZ | 05.08.2020 | |
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | ES | 05.08.2020 | |
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | ES | 05.08.2020 | |
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | LT | 05.08.2020 | |
NO | 05.11.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5167418 (DUNFORD JOSEPH R [CA]) [A] 1-15 * column 6, lines 30-33; figures 4,5,6,7,18 *; | [XA]US2001032759 (DEIBEL WILLIAM T [US]) [X] 8-11,13,14 * figure 2 * [A] 12,15; | [XAI]CN101280922 (HEBEI HONGYE MACHINERY CO LTD [CN]) [X] 8-10,13,14 * figure 1 * [A] 12,15[I] 11 | by applicant | CH662864 | EP1041320 |