EP3202357 - TEMPERATURE CONTROLLED SHORT DURATION ABLATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.12.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.04.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.02.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 07.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 10.04.2024 [2024/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biosense Webster (Israel) Ltd. 4 Hatnufa Street Yokneam, 2066717 / IL | [2022/26] |
Former [2017/32] | For all designated states Biosense Webster (Israel), Ltd. 4 Hatnufa Street Yokneam, 2066717 / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOVARI, Assaf c/o Biosense Webster (Israel) Ltd. 4 Hatnufa Street Yokneam 2066717 / IL | 02 /
EPHRATH, Yaron c/o Biosense Webster (Israel) Ltd. 4 Hatnufa Street Yokneam2066717 / IL | 03 /
ALTMAN, Andres Claudio c/o Biosense Webster (Israel) Ltd. 4 Hatnufa Street Yokneam 2066717 / IL | 04 /
ZILBERMAN, Israel c/o Biosense Webster (Israel) Ltd. 4 Hatnufa Street Yokneam 2066717 / IL | [2017/37] |
Former [2017/32] | 01 /
GOVARI, Assaf 4 Hatnufa Street 2066717 Yokneam / IL | ||
02 /
EPHRATH, Yaron 4 Hatnufa Street 2066717 Yokneam / IL | |||
03 /
ALTMAN, Andres Claudio 4 Hatnufa Street 2066717 Yokneam / IL | |||
04 /
ZILBERMAN, Israel 4 Hatnufa Street 2066717 Yokneam / IL | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2017/32] | Application number, filing date | 17152848.2 | 24.01.2017 | [2017/32] | Priority number, date | US201662286534P | 25.01.2016 Original published format: US 201662286534 P | US201615179167 | 10.06.2016 Original published format: US201615179167 | [2017/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3202357 | Date: | 09.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3202357 | Date: | 10.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/14 | [2017/32] | CPC: |
A61B18/1492 (EP,IL,US);
A61B18/12 (CN);
A61B18/14 (CN);
A61B2018/00029 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00351 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2018/00577 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00589 (CN);
A61B2018/00666 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00678 (EP,IL,US);
A61B2018/00702 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2018/00791 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2018/00875 (EP,CN,IL,US);
A61B2090/065 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/12] |
Former [2017/32] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | TEMPERATURGESTEUERTE ABLATION VON KURZER DAUER | [2017/32] | English: | TEMPERATURE CONTROLLED SHORT DURATION ABLATION | [2017/32] | French: | ABLATION DE COURTE DURÉE À TEMPÉRATURE CONTRÔLÉE | [2017/32] | Examination procedure | 24.01.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.02.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.02.2018 | Examination requested [2018/12] | 28.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 29.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2002077627 (JOHNSON THEODORE C [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * paragraphs [0082] , [0083] *; | [X]US2004193148 (WHAM ROBERT H [US], et al) [X] 1-3* paragraph [0108] *; | [X]US2013282084 (MATHUR PRABODH [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * paragraphs [0177] , [0179] , [0181]; figure 25 * * paragraph [0214] *; | [X]US2014275993 (BALLAKUR SOWMYA [US]) [X] 1-4 * paragraphs [0037] , [0038] * | by applicant | US7207989 | US2010057072 | US2011009857 | US2011130648 | US8641705 | US2014171821 | US8882761 | US2015272655 | - TOPP ET AL., "Saline-linked surface radiofrequency ablation: Factors affecting steam popping and depth of injury in the pig liver", ANN. SURG., (2004), vol. 239, no. 4, pages 518 - 27 |