EP3354737 - CELL-FREE PROTEIN SYNTHESIS SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.06.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.07.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.04.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.07.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.02.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 29.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastraße 27c 80686 München / DE | [2018/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Buntru, Matthias Ludwigsallee 131 52062 Aachen / DE | 02 /
Vogel, Simon Kronenberg 90 52074 Aachen / DE | 03 /
Schillberg, Stefan Dreiländerweg 107 52074 Aachen / DE | [2018/31] | Representative(s) | Roth, Andy Stefan Dr. Roth Patentanwaltskanzlei Kaistrasse 5 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | [2018/31] | Application number, filing date | 17153005.8 | 25.01.2017 | [2018/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3354737 | Date: | 01.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3354737 | Date: | 19.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/82, C12P21/00, C12P21/02 | [2018/31] | CPC: |
C12N15/8257 (EP,US);
A01N3/00 (US);
C12P21/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/11] |
Former [2018/31] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR ZELLFREIEN PROTEINSYNTHESE | [2018/31] | English: | CELL-FREE PROTEIN SYNTHESIS SYSTEM | [2018/31] | French: | SYSTÈME DE SYNTHÈSE DE PROTÉINE ACELLULAIRE | [2018/31] | Examination procedure | 31.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/11] | 31.01.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.08.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.07.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 14.07.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.07.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 20.05.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.01.2017 | AL | 19.08.2020 | CY | 19.08.2020 | CZ | 19.08.2020 | EE | 19.08.2020 | ES | 19.08.2020 | HR | 19.08.2020 | IT | 19.08.2020 | LT | 19.08.2020 | LV | 19.08.2020 | MC | 19.08.2020 | MK | 19.08.2020 | MT | 19.08.2020 | PL | 19.08.2020 | RO | 19.08.2020 | RS | 19.08.2020 | SI | 19.08.2020 | SK | 19.08.2020 | SM | 19.08.2020 | TR | 19.08.2020 | BG | 19.11.2020 | GR | 20.11.2020 | PT | 21.12.2020 | IE | 25.01.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 25.01.2017 | |
AL | 19.08.2020 | ||
CY | 19.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2020 | ||
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
ES | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
IT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
MC | 19.08.2020 | ||
MK | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SI | 19.08.2020 | ||
SK | 19.08.2020 | ||
SM | 19.08.2020 | ||
TR | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
IE | 25.01.2021 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 25.01.2017 | |
AL | 19.08.2020 | ||
CY | 19.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2020 | ||
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
ES | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
IT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
MC | 19.08.2020 | ||
MK | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SI | 19.08.2020 | ||
SK | 19.08.2020 | ||
SM | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
IE | 25.01.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 25.01.2017 | |
AL | 19.08.2020 | ||
CY | 19.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2020 | ||
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
ES | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
IT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
MC | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SI | 19.08.2020 | ||
SK | 19.08.2020 | ||
SM | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
IE | 25.01.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 19.08.2020 | |
CY | 19.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2020 | ||
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
ES | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
IT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
MC | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SI | 19.08.2020 | ||
SK | 19.08.2020 | ||
SM | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
IE | 25.01.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 19.08.2020 | |
CZ | 19.08.2020 | ||
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
ES | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
IT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
MC | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SI | 19.08.2020 | ||
SK | 19.08.2020 | ||
SM | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
IE | 25.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/40] | AL | 19.08.2020 | |
CZ | 19.08.2020 | ||
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
ES | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
IT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
MC | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SI | 19.08.2020 | ||
SK | 19.08.2020 | ||
SM | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 19.08.2020 | |
CZ | 19.08.2020 | ||
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
ES | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
IT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SI | 19.08.2020 | ||
SK | 19.08.2020 | ||
SM | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/34] | AL | 19.08.2020 | |
CZ | 19.08.2020 | ||
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
ES | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
IT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SK | 19.08.2020 | ||
SM | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 19.08.2020 | |
CZ | 19.08.2020 | ||
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
ES | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SK | 19.08.2020 | ||
SM | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 19.08.2020 | |
CZ | 19.08.2020 | ||
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
ES | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SM | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | CZ | 19.08.2020 | |
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SM | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | HR | 19.08.2020 | |
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | LT | 19.08.2020 | |
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | LT | 19.08.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2002039771 (PETERS LARS-ERIK [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0051] * [Y] 3; | [XY]US2003199076 (KUROITA TOSHIHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6-12,14,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0088] * [Y] 3; | [XY]WO2016112258 (SUTRO BIOPHARMA INC [US]) [X] 1,2,5-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0023] * [Y] 3; | [X] - SIDESO ODAFE F P ET AL, "The characteristics and stabilization of a caffeine demethylase enzyme complex", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF FOOD SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, BLACKWELL SCIENTIFIC PUBLICATIONS, OXFORD, GB, vol. 36, no. 6, doi:10.1046/J.1365-2621.2001.00496.X, ISSN 0950-5423, (20010801), pages 693 - 698, (20011220), XP008183826 [X] 1,2,4,6-15 * abstract * * Preparation of cell-free extracts; page 694, column r * * Freeze drying; page 694, column r * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1365-2621.2001.00496.x | [Y] - BUNTRU M ET AL, "A versatile coupled cell-free transcription-translation system based on tobacco BY-2 cell lysates", BIOTECHNOLOGY AND BIOENGINEERING 20150501 JOHN WILEY AND SONS INC. USA, (20150501), vol. 112, no. 5, doi:10.1002/BIT.25502, pages 867 - 878, XP002768481 [Y] 3 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/BIT.25502 | [Y] - MATTHIAS BUNTRU ET AL, "Tobacco BY-2 cell-free lysate: an alternative and highly-productive plant-based in vitro translation system", BMC BIOTECHNOLOGY, BIOMED CENTRAL LTD. LONDON, GB, (20140503), vol. 14, no. 1, doi:10.1186/1472-6750-14-37, ISSN 1472-6750, page 37, XP021184658 [Y] 3 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1472-6750-14-37 | by applicant | US6168931 | US6337191 | - BUNTRU ET AL., BMC BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2014), vol. 14, page 37 | - BUNTRU ET AL., BIOTECHNOLOGY AND BIOENGINEERING, (2015), vol. 112, no. 5, pages 867 - 878 | - GOERKE, A. R. ET AL., "Development of cell-free protein synthesis platforms for disulfide bonded proteins", BIOTECHNOL. BIOENG., (2008), vol. 99, pages 351 - 367 | - KANTER, G. ET AL., "Cell-free production of scFv fusion proteins: An efficient approach for personalized lymphoma vaccines", BLOOD, (2007), vol. 109, doi:doi:10.1182/blood-2006-07-030593, pages 3393 - 3399, XP055235253 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood-2006-07-030593 | - STECH, M. ET AL., "Production of functional antibody fragments in a vesicle-based eukaryotic cell-free translation system", J. BIOTECHNOL., (2012), vol. 164, doi:doi:10.1016/j.jbiotec.2012.08.020, pages 220 - 231, XP028990879 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jbiotec.2012.08.020 | - YANG, J. ET AL., "Rapid expression of vaccine proteins for B-cell lymphoma in a cell-free system", BIOTECHNOL. BIOENG., (2005), vol. 89, doi:doi:10.1002/bit.20283, pages 503 - 511, XP002555162 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/bit.20283 | - YIN, G. ET AL., "Aglycosylated antibodies and antibody fragments produced in a scalable in vitro transcription-translation system", MABS, (2012), vol. 4, doi:doi:10.4161/MABS.4.2.19202, pages 217 - 225, XP002711741 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4161/MABS.4.2.19202 | - ZAWADA, J. F. ET AL., "Microscale to manufacturing scale-up of cell-free cytokine production- a new approach for shortening protein production development timelines", BIOTECHNOL. BIOENG, (2011), vol. 108, doi:doi:10.1002/bit.23103, pages 1570 - 1578, XP055076263 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/bit.23103 | - MADIN, K. ET AL., "A highly efficient and robust cell-free protein synthesis system prepared from wheat embryos: Plants apparently contain a suicide system directed at ribosomes", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (2000), vol. 97, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.97.2.559, pages 559 - 564, XP002948543 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.97.2.559 | - TAKAI, K ET AL., "Practical cell-free protein synthesis system using purified wheat embryos", NAT. PROTOC., (2010), vol. 5, pages 227 - 238 | - CARLSON, E. D. ET AL., "Cell-free protein synthesis: Applications come of age", BIOTECHNOL. ADV., (2012), vol. 30, doi:doi:10.1016/j.biotechadv.2011.09.016, pages 1185 - 1194, XP055072004 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.biotechadv.2011.09.016 | - ZUBAY, G., ANN. REV. GENET, (1973), vol. 7, page 267 | - GOSHIMA, N. ET AL., "Human protein factory for converting the transcriptome into an in vitro-expressed proteome", NAT. METHODS, (2008), vol. 5, pages 1011 - 1017 | - HOFFMANN, M. ET AL., Biotechnol Annu Rev, ELSEVIER, (2004), vol. 10, pages 1 - 30 | - JACKSON, R. J. ET AL., Methods Enzymol, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1983), vol. 96, pages 50 - 74 | - EZURE, T ET AL., "A cell- free protein synthesis system from insect cells", METHODS MOL. BIOL., (2010), vol. 607, pages 31 - 42, XP009164449 | - KUBICK, S ET AL., Current Topics in Membranes, ACADEMIC PRESS, (2009), vol. 63, pages 25 - 49 | - TARUI, H. ET AL., "Establishment and characterization of cell-free translation/glycosylation in insect cell (Spodoptera frugiperda 21) extract prepared with high pressure treatment", APPL. MICROBIOL. BIOTECHNOL., (2001), vol. 55, doi:doi:10.1007/s002530000534, pages 446 - 453, XP002272560 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s002530000534 | - KOVTUN, 0. ET AL., "Towards the construction of expressed proteomes using a Leishmania tarentolae based cell-free expression system", PLOS ONE, (2010), vol. 5, page EL4388 | - MUREEV, S. ET AL., "Species-independent translational leaders facilitate cell-free expression", NAT. BIOTECHNOL, (2009), vol. 27, pages 747 - 752 | - "Cell-Free Protein Production", MIKAMI, S. ET AL., Methods in Molecular Biology, HUMANA PRESS, (2010), vol. 607, pages 43 - 52 | - BRADFORD MM., "A rapid and sensitive method for the quantitation of microgram quantities of protein utilizing the principle of protein-dye binding.", ANAL BIOCHEM, (1976), vol. 72, doi:doi:10.1016/0003-2697(76)90527-3, pages 248 - 54, XP025650297 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0003-2697(76)90527-3 | - BUNTRU M; VOGEL S; SPIEGEL H; SCHILLBERG S., "Tobacco BY-2 cell-free lysate: an alternative and highly-productive plant-based in vitro translation system.", BMC BIOTECHNOL., (2014), vol. 14, doi:doi:10.1186/1472-6750-14-37, page 37, XP021184658 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1472-6750-14-37 | - BUNTRU M; VOGEL S; STOFF K; SPIEGEL H; SCHILLBERG S., "A Versatile Coupled Cell-Free Transcription-Translation System Based on Tobacco BY-2 Cell Lysate", BIOTECHNOL. BIOENG., (2015), vol. 112, no. 5, doi:doi:10.1002/BIT.25502, pages 867 - 78, XP002768481 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/BIT.25502 | - GURSINSKY T; SCHULZ B; BEHRENS SE., "Replication of Tomato bushy stunt virus RNA in a plant in vitro system", VIROLOGY, (2009), vol. 390, no. 2, doi:doi:10.1016/j.virol.2009.05.009, pages 250 - 60, XP026284545 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.virol.2009.05.009 | - HODGMAN CE; JEWETT MC, "Optimized extract preparation methods and reaction conditions for improved yeast cell-free protein synthesis", BIOTECHNOL BIOENG, (2013), vol. 110, no. 10, pages 2643 - 54 | - KOMODA K; NAITO S; ISHIKAWA M., "Replication of plant RNA virus genomes in a cell-free extract of evacuolated plant protoplasts.", PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (2004), vol. 101, no. 7, pages 1863 - 1867 |