Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
18.05.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.06.2018 [2018/25] |
06.02.2018 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
20.01.2018 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
26.05.2017 | Change - inventor | published on 28.06.2017 [2017/26] |
19.05.2017 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 21.06.2017 [2017/25] |
19.05.2017 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
19.05.2017 | Request for examination filed | published on 21.06.2017 [2017/25] |
07.02.2017 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
01.02.2017 | Change - representative |