Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9186687 | Global Dossier | 17.11.2015 | B2 | US2013029828 | 31.01.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | SE1000085 | 29.01.2010 | WO2011SE50091 | 28.01.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101467647B | Global Dossier | 01.12.2014 | B1 | KR20120099294 | 07.09.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | SE1000085 | 29.01.2010 | WO2011SE50091 | 28.01.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5735006B | Global Dossier | 17.06.2015 | B2 | JP2013517939 | 20.05.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | SE1000085 | 29.01.2010 | WO2011SE50091 | 28.01.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2528690 | Global Dossier | 30.05.2018 | B1 | EP2528690 | 24.08.2016 | A4 | EP2528690 | 05.12.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | SE1000085 | 29.01.2010 | WO2011SE50091 | 28.01.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102712002B | Global Dossier | 05.08.2015 | B | CN102712002 | 03.10.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | SE1000085 | 29.01.2010 | WO2011SE50091 | 28.01.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2011209989B | Global Dossier | 05.12.2013 | B2 | AU2011209989 | 16.08.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | SE1000085 | 29.01.2010 | WO2011SE50091 | 28.01.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3181232 | Global Dossier | 21.06.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP11737370 | 28.01.2011 | SE1000085 | 29.01.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112012017879 | 29.03.2016 | A2 | Priority number | Date | SE1000085 | 29.01.2010 | WO2011SE50091 | 28.01.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2786668 | 22.09.2015 | C | CA2786668 | 04.08.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | SE1000085 | 29.01.2010 | WO2011SE50091 | 28.01.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2524967 | 10.08.2014 | C2 | RU2012136776 | 10.03.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | SE1000085 | 29.01.2010 | WO2011SE50091 | 28.01.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2011093784 | Global Dossier | 04.08.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | SE1000085 | 29.01.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | SE535959 | 05.03.2013 | C2 | SE1000085 | 30.07.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | SE1000085 | 29.01.2010 | Type | Earlier application | EP2528690 |