Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
06.12.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.01.2020 [2020/02] |
28.08.2019 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
07.03.2019 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
14.08.2018 | Change - representative | |
25.05.2018 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
25.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant | |
25.05.2018 | Request for examination filed | published on 27.06.2018 [2018/26] |
25.05.2018 | Change - designated states | published on 27.06.2018 [2018/26] |
31.01.2018 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
20.10.2017 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 22.11.2017 [2017/47] |
31.05.2017 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
03.02.2017 | Change - representative |