EP3246035 - DEVICES AND AGENTS FOR DENERVATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.12.2019 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.05.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.12.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.01.2020 [2020/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Evans, Michael A. 6254 Grand Oak Way San Jose, CA 95135 / US | For all designated states Venkateswara-Rao, Kondapavulur T. 6254 Grand Oak Way San Jose, CA 95135 / US | For all designated states Stein, Emily A. 6254 Grand Oak Way San Jose, CA 95135 / US | [2017/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2017/47] | Representative(s) | Lee, Nicholas John, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/47] | Hart, Deborah Mary, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | Application number, filing date | 17154220.2 | 26.01.2011 | [2017/47] | Priority number, date | US20100336838P | 26.01.2010 Original published format: US 336838 P | [2017/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3246035 | Date: | 22.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/7048, A61K31/198, A61K31/55, A61K45/06, A61M25/06, A61M25/00, A61K39/00, A61P9/12 | [2017/47] | CPC: |
A61M25/0084 (EP,CN,US);
A61B5/0215 (EP,CN,US);
A61B5/4094 (EP,CN,US);
A61B5/4839 (EP,CN,US);
A61K31/198 (EP,US);
A61K31/55 (EP,US);
A61K31/7048 (EP,CN,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61M25/04 (EP,CN,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/04 (EP);
A61P9/06 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
A61B2017/22054 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/22061 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/22067 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2090/378 (EP,US);
A61B2090/3784 (EP,US);
A61M2025/0086 (EP,CN,US);
A61M2025/0087 (EP,CN,US);
A61M2025/1047 (EP,CN,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/198, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/55, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/7048, A61K2300/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/26] |
Former [2017/47] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNGEN UND MITTEL ZUR DENERVIERUNG | [2017/47] | English: | DEVICES AND AGENTS FOR DENERVATION | [2017/47] | French: | DISPOSITIFS ET AGENTS DE DÉNERVATION | [2017/47] | Examination procedure | 01.02.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.05.2018 | Examination requested [2018/26] | 01.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/02] | 29.08.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2020/02] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP11703963.6 / EP2528649 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2019 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2005192638 (GELFAND MARK [US], et al) [Y] 1-8 * paragraphs [0002] , [0008] , [0014] , [0015] , [0036] , [0037] , [0044]; claims 1,9,13 *; | [Y] - RAYMOND B FINK ET AL, "A new approach to differential peripheral nerve fiber block: Na+, K+ ATPase inhibition", ANESTHESIOLOGY, (19821231), vol. 57, pages 127 - 131, XP055414827 [Y] 1-8 * page 127, column r, paragraph 2 - page 128, column l, paragraph 1 * * page 129, column r, paragraph l - page 130, column l, paragraph 1 * | [Y] - Sm Rothman, "The neurotoxicity of excitatory amino acids is produced by passive chloride influx", Journal of Neuroscience, UNITED STATES, (19850601), pages 1483 - 1489, URL: http://www.jneurosci.org/content/jneuro/5/6/1483.full.pdf, XP055414830 [Y] 4-8 * abstract * * page 1483, column r, paragraphs 1,2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1523/JNEUROSCI.05-06-01483.1985 | [A] - HUANG BING S ET AL, "Digoxin Prevents Ouabain and High Salt Intake-Induced Hypertension in Rats With Sinoaortic Denervation", HYPERTENSION, LIPPINCOTT WILLIAMS & WILKINS, US, (19991001), vol. 34, no. 4, doi:10.1161/01.HYP.34.4.733, ISSN 0194-911X, pages 733 - 738, XP009500666 [A] 1-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1161/01.HYP.34.4.733 |