Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2019374438 | Global Dossier | 12.12.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2018EP52406 | 31.01.2018 | EP17154374 | 02.02.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3576710 | Global Dossier | 11.12.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2018EP52406 | 31.01.2018 | EP17154374 | 02.02.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN110248636 | Global Dossier | 17.09.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2018EP52406 | 31.01.2018 | EP17154374 | 02.02.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2019127603 | 02.03.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2018EP52406 | 31.01.2018 | EP17154374 | 02.02.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2018141795 | Global Dossier | 09.08.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP17154374 | 02.02.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3357479 | Global Dossier | 08.08.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP17154374 | 02.02.2017 |