EP3357479 - BREASTFEEDING SUPPORTING SYSTEM AND CORRESPONDING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 09.09.2018 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 06.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.12.2018 | Refusal of application | published on 30.01.2019 [2019/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2018/32] | Representative(s) | de Haan, Poul Erik Philips International B.V. Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2018/32] | Application number, filing date | 17154374.7 | 02.02.2017 | [2018/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3357479 | Date: | 08.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61J13/00 | [2018/32] | CPC: |
A61J13/00 (EP,US);
A61J2200/70 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STILLUNTERSTÜTZUNGSSYSTEM UND ZUGEHÖRIGES VERFAHREN | [2018/32] | English: | BREASTFEEDING SUPPORTING SYSTEM AND CORRESPONDING METHOD | [2018/32] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ASSISTANCE À L'ALLAITEMENT ET PROCÉDÉ CORRESPONDANT | [2018/32] | Examination procedure | 10.09.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) [2019/05] | 21.12.2018 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/05] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2012055265 (MELAMED OFER [IL]) [X] 1,9,10,14,15 * figure 9 * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0110] - paragraph [0113] * [A] 2-8,11-13; | [A]EP2658503 (KONINKL PHILIPS NV [NL]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [X]US2016291603 (CHIN HON WAH [US], et al) [X] 1,2,9,10,14,15 * figures 1b, 2F, 8-11 * * paragraph [0102] * * paragraph [0164] - paragraph [0168] * * paragraph [0175] - paragraph [0186] * * paragraph [0198] - paragraph [0218] * * paragraph [0405] * |