EP3358534 - DELEGATION OF ACCESS RIGHTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.06.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 06.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.07.2019 [2019/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states dormakaba Deutschland GmbH Dorma Platz 1 58256 Ennepetal / DE | [2018/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FIEGE, Gero Dorma Platz 1 58256 Ennepetal / DE | 02 /
FANARJI, Alexander Dorma Platz 1 58256 Ennepetal / DE | 03 /
WOLF, Martin Dorma Platz 1 58256 Ennepetal / DE | 04 /
SCHWARZ, Dieter DORMA Platz 1 58256 Ennepetal / DE | 05 /
KRAVCHENKO, Ivan DORMA Platz 1 58256 Ennepetal / DE | 06 /
GIERNICH, Stephan DORMA Platz 1 58256 Ennepetal / DE | 07 /
HIRTSIEFER, Werner DORMA Platz 1 58256 Ennepetal / DE | 08 /
SCHMIDT, Andreas DORMA Platz 1 58256 Ennepetal / DE | 09 /
ESCH, Simone DORMA Platz 1 58256 Ennepetal / DE | [2018/32] | Representative(s) | Balder IP Law, S.L. Paseo de la Castellana 93 5ª planta 28046 Madrid / ES | [2018/32] | Application number, filing date | 17154714.4 | 03.02.2017 | [2018/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3358534 | Date: | 08.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G07C9/00 | [2018/32] | CPC: |
G07C9/00571 (EP);
G07C2209/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DELEGIEREN VON ZUGANGSRECHTEN | [2018/32] | English: | DELEGATION OF ACCESS RIGHTS | [2018/32] | French: | DÉLÉGATION DE DROITS D'ACCÈS | [2018/32] | Examination procedure | 09.02.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/29] | 26.02.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2019/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2014239647 (JADALLAH SAMIR [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0011] , [0 98]; figures 13, 15c, 20 * * paragraphs [0101] , [ 112] , [ 118] , [ 132] , [ 134] , [ 135] , [ 141] - [0143] - [ 147] *; | [XI]US2014266573 (SULLIVAN EDWARD [US]) [X] 1-7,10,13-15 * paragraphs [0021] , [0023] , [0026] , [0027] , [0029] , [0033] , [0041] , [0042]; figures 3, 5 * * paragraphs [0030] , [0 34] , [0 35] * [I] 1,8,11; | [A]EP2819103 (EVVA SICHERHEITSTECHNOLOGIE [AT]) [A] 1,5,13* paragraph [0033]; figure 1 * |