EP3205446 - AUTOMATIC MACHINE FOR MACHINING INNER OR CENTRING RINGS OF SPIRALLY WOUND SEALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.10.2018 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GSKET S.r.l. Via Marazzi 7 26013 Crema (CR) / IT | [2017/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAROZZI, Gian Piero GSKET S.r.l. Via Marazzi, 7 26013 Crema (CR) / IT | [2017/33] | Representative(s) | Raimondi, Margherita, et al Dott. Ing. Prof. Alfredo Raimondi S.r.l. Piazzale Cadorna, 15 20123 Milano / IT | [2017/33] | Application number, filing date | 17154756.5 | 06.02.2017 | [2017/33] | Priority number, date | IT2016UB00699 | 12.02.2016 Original published format: IT UB20160699 | [2017/33] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3205446 | Date: | 16.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3205446 | Date: | 22.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B23Q1/66, B23Q7/04 | [2017/33] | CPC: |
B23Q1/66 (EP,US);
B23Q1/26 (CN);
B23B13/024 (US);
B23B3/22 (US);
B23Q7/00 (CN);
B23Q7/02 (US);
B23Q7/04 (CN);
B23Q7/043 (CN);
B23Q7/046 (US);
B23Q7/048 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/33] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUTOMATISCHE MASCHINE ZUM BEARBEITEN VON INNEN- ODER ZENTRIERRINGEN SPIRALGEWICKELTER DICHTUNGEN | [2017/33] | English: | AUTOMATIC MACHINE FOR MACHINING INNER OR CENTRING RINGS OF SPIRALLY WOUND SEALS | [2017/33] | French: | MACHINE AUTOMATIQUE D'USINAGE DE BAGUES DE CENTRAGE OU INTERNES DE JOINTS ENROULÉS EN SPIRALE. | [2017/33] | Examination procedure | 23.05.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/47] | 28.06.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2018/47] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE3437505 (PINTO SPA MARIO [IT]) [Y] 2* abstract *; | [Y]US4829716 (UEDA SHUJI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-4,6,9,10 * figures 1,4,5 *; | [Y]EP0453710 (MINGANTI SPA [IT]) [Y] 1-4,6,9,10 * figures 1-3 *; | [Y]US2008060182 (WAWRZYNIAK WALTER W [US]) [Y] 1-4,6,9,10 * paragraph [0001]; figures 1-2; claim 1 * | by applicant | US4829716 | EP0453710 |