EP3357571 - PROCESS TO PREVENT AND EXTINGUISH A DEFLAGRATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.07.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 06.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.08.2019 [2019/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer Aktiengesellschaft Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee 1 51373 Leverkusen / DE | [2018/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Morhenn, Heinrich Grevenbroicher Str. 104 50829 Köln / DE | 02 /
Pohl, Uwe Schlebuscher Heide 11 51375 Leverkusen / DE | [2018/32] | Representative(s) | BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Straße 50 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/32] | BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | Application number, filing date | 17154966.0 | 07.02.2017 | [2018/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3357571 | Date: | 08.08.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B01J3/00, A62C3/00, A62C3/04 | [2018/32] | CPC: |
B01J3/006 (EP);
A62C37/36 (US);
A62D1/0042 (US);
A62C3/002 (EP);
A62C3/04 (EP);
B01J2219/00263 (EP);
B01J2219/00265 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERMEIDUNG UND LÖSCHUNG EINER DEFLAGRATION BEI DEFLAGRATIONSFÄHIGEN STOFFEN | [2018/32] | English: | PROCESS TO PREVENT AND EXTINGUISH A DEFLAGRATION | [2018/32] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR PRÉVENIR ET ARRETER UNE DEFLAGRATION | [2018/32] | Examination procedure | 09.02.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/33] | 27.03.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2019/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2009068729 (MARICAP OY [FI], et al) [I] 1-14 * page 1, lines 15-17 * * page 3, lines 2-14 * * page 6, line 7 - page 7, line 2; figure -; claim - *; | [AD]WO2014139876 (BAYER TECHNOLOGY SERVICES GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0699645 (ICI PLC [GB]) [A] 1-14 * page 1, lines 8-13 * * page 2, lines 22-26,36-42 * * page 4, line 50 - page 5, line 4; figure 1 *; | [A]US2007204480 (GRAY DONALD J [US]) [A] 1-14 * paragraphs [0001] , [0039] , [0041] , [0 42] , [0051] - [0053] - [0 57] , [0070] , [0 73] , [0081] *; | [A]DE102012008743 (REMBE GMBH SAFETY & CONTROL [DE]) [A] 6,7 * claim - * | by applicant | WO2014139876 | - "Sektion 23", Transportation of Dangerous Goods, Manual of Tests and Criteria. 5th Revised Ed., (2009), page 237 FF | - VDI2263-1, (1990), page 13 | EP20170154912 |