EP3214063 - TERMINAL CONJUGATED TRIENAL ACETAL COMPOUND AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING TERMINAL CONJUGATED TRIENAL COMPOUND USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.2019 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.04.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.03.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 6-1 Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2017/36] | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 6-1, Otemachi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISHIBASHI, Naoki c/o Specialty Chemicals Research Center SHIN-ETSU CHEMICAL CO., LTD. 28-1, Nishi-Fukushima, Kubiki-ku, Joetsu-shi Niigata-ken / JP | 02 /
WAKAMORI, Shinnosuke c/o Specialty Chemicals Research Center SHIN-ETSU CHEMICAL CO., LTD. 28-1, Nishi-Fukushima, Kubiki-ku, Joetsu-shi Niigata-ken / JP | 03 /
MIYAKE, Yuki c/o Specialty Chemicals Research Center SHIN-ETSU CHEMICAL CO., LTD. 28-1, Nishi-Fukushima, Kubiki-ku, Joetsu-shi Niigata-ken / JP | 04 /
YAMASHITA, Miyoshi c/o Specialty Chemicals Research Center SHIN-ETSU CHEMICAL CO., LTD. 28-1, Nishi-Fukushima, Kubiki-ku, Joetsu-shi Niigata-ken / JP | 05 /
KINSHO, Takeshi c/o Specialty Chemicals Research Center SHIN-ETSU CHEMICAL CO., LTD. 28-1, Nishi-Fukushima, Kubiki-ku, Joetsu-shi Niigata-ken / JP | [2017/36] | Representative(s) | Vidon Brevets & Stratégie 16B, rue de Jouanet BP 90333 35703 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR | [2018/37] |
Former [2017/36] | Marollé, Patrick Pierre Pascal Cabinet Vidon 16B, rue Jouanet B.P. 90333 Technopôle Atalante FR-35703 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR | Application number, filing date | 17155454.6 | 09.02.2017 | [2017/36] | Priority number, date | JP20160041069 | 03.03.2016 Original published format: JP 2016041069 | [2017/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3214063 | Date: | 06.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3214063 | Date: | 12.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C07C47/21, C07C45/59, C07C43/303, C07C45/51, C07D317/12, C07C41/50 | [2018/17] | CPC: |
C07C43/303 (EP,CN,US);
C07C41/50 (EP,US);
C07C41/54 (US);
C07C45/00 (US);
C07C45/42 (CN);
C07C45/515 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C07C41/50, C07C43/303 (US,EP);
C07C45/42, C07C47/21 (CN);
C07C45/515, C07C47/21 (EP,US);
C07C45/59, C07C47/21 (US,CN,EP) |
Former IPC [2017/36] | C07C47/21, C07C45/59, C07C43/303, C07C45/51, C07D317/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/15] |
Former [2017/36] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ENDKONJUGIERTE TRIENAL-ACETALVERBINDUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER ENDKONJUGIERTEN TRIENALVERBINDUNG UNTER VERWENDUNG DER ENDKONJUGIERTEN TRIENAL-ACETALVERBINDUNG | [2018/20] | English: | TERMINAL CONJUGATED TRIENAL ACETAL COMPOUND AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING TERMINAL CONJUGATED TRIENAL COMPOUND USING THE SAME | [2017/36] | French: | COMPOSÉ D'ACÉTAL TRIENAL CONJUGUÉ TERMINAL ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UN COMPOSÉ TRIENAL CONJUGUÉ TERMINAL L'UTILISANT | [2017/36] |
Former [2017/36] | ENDKONJUGIERTE TRIENAL-ACETALVERBINDUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER ENDKONJUGIERTEN TRIENALVERBINDUNG DAMIT | Examination procedure | 09.02.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/15] | 18.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.07.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 13.06.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/34] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.02.2017 | AL | 12.09.2018 | AT | 12.09.2018 | CY | 12.09.2018 | CZ | 12.09.2018 | DK | 12.09.2018 | EE | 12.09.2018 | ES | 12.09.2018 | FI | 12.09.2018 | HR | 12.09.2018 | IT | 12.09.2018 | LT | 12.09.2018 | LV | 12.09.2018 | MC | 12.09.2018 | MK | 12.09.2018 | NL | 12.09.2018 | PL | 12.09.2018 | RO | 12.09.2018 | RS | 12.09.2018 | SE | 12.09.2018 | SI | 12.09.2018 | SK | 12.09.2018 | SM | 12.09.2018 | TR | 12.09.2018 | BG | 12.12.2018 | NO | 12.12.2018 | GR | 13.12.2018 | IS | 12.01.2019 | PT | 12.01.2019 | IE | 09.02.2019 | LU | 09.02.2019 | MT | 09.02.2019 | BE | 28.02.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 09.02.2017 | |
AL | 12.09.2018 | ||
AT | 12.09.2018 | ||
CY | 12.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
DK | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
IT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
MC | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SI | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
SM | 12.09.2018 | ||
TR | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
IE | 09.02.2019 | ||
LU | 09.02.2019 | ||
MT | 09.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
AT | 12.09.2018 | ||
CY | 12.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
DK | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
IT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
MC | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SI | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
SM | 12.09.2018 | ||
TR | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
IE | 09.02.2019 | ||
LU | 09.02.2019 | ||
MT | 09.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
AT | 12.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
DK | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
IT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
MC | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SI | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
SM | 12.09.2018 | ||
TR | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
IE | 09.02.2019 | ||
LU | 09.02.2019 | ||
MT | 09.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
AT | 12.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
DK | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
IT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
MC | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SI | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
SM | 12.09.2018 | ||
TR | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
IE | 09.02.2019 | ||
LU | 09.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
AT | 12.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
DK | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
IT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
MC | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SI | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
SM | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
IE | 09.02.2019 | ||
LU | 09.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
AT | 12.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
DK | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
IT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
MC | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SI | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
SM | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
IE | 09.02.2019 | ||
LU | 09.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
AT | 12.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
DK | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
IT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
MC | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SI | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
SM | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
LU | 09.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/45] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
AT | 12.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
DK | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
IT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
MC | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SI | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
SM | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
AT | 12.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
DK | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
IT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SI | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
SM | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
AT | 12.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
DK | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
IT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
SM | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
AT | 12.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
IT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
SM | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
AT | 12.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
IT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
IT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
IT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | FI | 12.09.2018 | |
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | FI | 12.09.2018 | |
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 12.09.2018 | |
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 12.09.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - W. FISCHETTI ET.AL., "Palladium-catalyzed syntheses of conjugated polyenes", J. ORG. CHEM., (1983), vol. 48, pages 948 - 955, XP002771485 [A] 1-6 * page 949, left column, compound (6) * | [A] - J.G. MILLAR, "Synthesis of 9Z,11E, 13-tetradecatrienal, the major component of the sex pheromone of the carob moth, ectomyelois ceratoniae (Lepidoptera: Pyralidae)", AGRIC. BIOL. CHEM., (1990), vol. 54, no. 9, pages 2473 - 2476, XP002771486 [A] 1-6 * Scheme 1 * | [AD] - FREDERIQUE TELLIER ET.AL., "Stereospecific synthesis of (Z,E)-9,11,13-tetradecatrien-1-yl acetate and aldehyde sex pheromon components of stenoma cecropia and ectomyelois ceratoniae", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (1990), vol. 31, no. 16, pages 2295 - 2298, XP002771487 [AD] 1-6 * page 2296, scheme * | by applicant | - TETRAHEDRON LETT., (1989), vol. 30, page 2901 | - J. CHEM. ECOL., (1996), vol. 22, page 1103 | - TETRAHEDRON LETT., (1990), vol. 31, page 2295 | - INGENIERIA Y CIENCIA QUIMICA, (2000), vol. 19, no. 2, page 55 |