EP3196253 - POLYCARBONATE RESIN COMPOSITION AND MOLDED ARTICLE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.09.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.04.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation 1-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8251 / JP | [2018/01] |
Former [2017/35] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation 1-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8251 / JP | ||
Former [2017/30] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation 1-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8251 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SASAKI, Haruo c/o Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation 1-1, Kurosakishiroishi, Yahatanishi-ku Kitakyushu-shi Fukuoka 806-004 / JP | 02 /
TANAKA, Tomohiko c/o Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation 1-1, Kurosakishiroishi, Yahatanishi-ku Kitakyushu-shi Fukuoka 806-004 / JP | [2017/30] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2017/30] | Application number, filing date | 17155456.1 | 12.01.2012 | [2017/30] | Priority number, date | JP20110079416 | 31.03.2011 Original published format: JP 2011079416 | [2017/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3196253 | Date: | 26.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3196253 | Date: | 09.10.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C08L69/00, C08L51/04, C08L55/02 | [2024/19] | CPC: |
C08L69/00 (EP,KR,US);
C08G64/02 (KR);
C08J5/00 (KR);
C08L53/02 (KR);
C08L51/04 (EP,US);
C08L55/02 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L69/00, C08L51/04 (US,EP);
C08L69/00, C08L55/02 (EP,US) |
Former IPC [2017/30] | C08L69/00, C08L51/00, C08G64/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/30] | Title | German: | POLYCARBONATHARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND FORMGEGENSTAND DARAUS | [2024/40] | English: | POLYCARBONATE RESIN COMPOSITION AND MOLDED ARTICLE THEREOF | [2017/30] | French: | COMPOSITION DE RÉSINE POLYCARBONATE ET ARTICLE MOULÉ OBTENU À PARTIR DE LADITE COMPOSITION | [2024/19] |
Former [2017/30] | POLYCARBONATHARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND FORMARTIKEL DARAUS | ||
Former [2017/30] | COMPOSITION DE RÉSINE POLYCARBONATE ET ARTICLE MOULÉ OBTENUE À PARTIR DE LADITE COMPOSITION | Examination procedure | 09.02.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.03.2017 | Examination requested [2017/30] | 23.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.08.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 27.08.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.08.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP12763864.1 / EP2692797 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 24.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 25.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2006257126 (TEIJIN CHEMICALS LTD) [Y] 1-13* examples 9-10; table 3 *; | [A]US2008090958 (RUEDIGER CLAUS [DE], et al) [A] 1-13 * examples 1-6 * * table 1 *; | [A]EP1942146 (CHEIL IND INC [KR]) [A] 1-13 * examples 1-2 * * tables 1-2 * * paragraph [0047] *; | [Y]EP2149589 (TEIJIN LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-13 * claims 1-11 * * examples 1-8 * | by applicant | GB1079686 | WO2008146719 |