EP3361420 - AVATAR RELATIONSHIPS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.06.2019 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 13.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.07.2019 [2019/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2018/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Charlotte Dorothea Wilhelmina, VINKERS c/o Philips International B.V. - Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
Arlette, VAN WISSEN c/o Philips International B.V. - Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
Aart Tijmen, VAN HALTEREN c/o Philips International B.V. - Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2018/33] | Representative(s) | de Haan, Poul Erik Philips International B.V. Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2018/33] | Application number, filing date | 17155529.5 | 10.02.2017 | [2018/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3361420 | Date: | 15.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06N3/00 | [2018/33] | CPC: |
G06N3/006 (EP,US);
A63B24/0075 (US);
G06V40/174 (US);
G10L17/26 (US);
G16H20/30 (US);
G16H20/60 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/33] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AVATAR-BEZIEHUNGEN | [2018/33] | English: | AVATAR RELATIONSHIPS | [2018/33] | French: | RELATIONS D'AVATAR | [2018/33] | Examination procedure | 16.02.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/29] | 01.03.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2019/29] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2019 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2016193839 (KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS NV [NL]) [X] 1,3,8,9,11,16,17 * abstract * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0050] * * figures 1,2,5 *[I] 2,4-7,10,12-15 |