EP3219706 - PROCESS FOR MAKING ISOQUINOLINE COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.08.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2018 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fibrogen, Inc. 409 Illinois Street San Francisco, CA 94158 / US | [2017/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THOMPSON, Michael D. c/o FibroGen Inc. 409 Illinois St. San Francisco, CA 94158 / US | 02 /
PARK, Jung Min c/o FibroGen Inc. 409 Illinois St. San Francisco, CA 94158 / US | 03 /
AREND, Michael P. c/o FibroGen Inc. 409 Illinois St. San Francisco, CA 94158 / US | [2017/38] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2017/38] | Application number, filing date | 17155678.0 | 15.07.2013 | [2017/38] | Priority number, date | US201261672191P | 16.07.2012 Original published format: US 201261672191 P | [2017/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3219706 | Date: | 20.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C07D217/26 | [2017/38] | CPC: |
C07D217/26 (EP,CN,US);
A61P39/00 (EP);
A61P7/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ISOCHINOLINVERBINDUNGEN | [2017/38] | English: | PROCESS FOR MAKING ISOQUINOLINE COMPOUNDS | [2017/38] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE COMPOSÉS D'ISOQUINOLINE | [2017/38] | Examination procedure | 21.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/40] | 07.05.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2018/40] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP13740184.0 / EP2872487 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2018 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US2004254215 (AREND MICHAEL P [US], et al) | by applicant | US4558006 | US4667016 | US6093730 | WO2005118836 | US2006276477 | US2007004627 | US2007259960 | US7323475 | US7629357 | US7928120 |