EP3361412 - BLACK ICE DETECTION SYSTEM, PROGRAM, AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.07.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2018/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN DEN BERGHE, Sven 12 Woodland Close Marlow, Buckinghamshire SL7 3LE / GB | [2023/16] |
Former [2018/33] | 01 /
van den BERGHE, Sven 12 Woodland Close Marlow, Buckinghamshire SL7 3LE / GB | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Cheapside House 138 Cheapside London EC2V 6BJ / GB | [2023/36] |
Former [2018/33] | Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | Application number, filing date | 17155708.5 | 10.02.2017 | [2018/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3361412 | Date: | 15.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3361412 | Date: | 06.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06V20/52, G06V10/82, G06V10/44, G06V10/764, G06V20/56, G08G1/04, G08G1/095, G08G1/0967 | [2023/14] | CPC: |
G06V10/454 (EP,US);
G06V10/764 (EP,US);
G06V10/82 (EP,US);
G06V20/52 (EP,US);
G06V20/56 (EP,US);
G08G1/04 (EP);
G08G1/095 (EP);
G08G1/096716 (EP);
G08G1/096741 (EP);
G08G1/096775 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/33] | G06K9/00, G06K9/46, G06K9/62, G08G1/048 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/33] | Title | German: | SCHWARZEISDETEKTIONSSYSTEM, -PROGRAMM UND -VERFAHREN | [2018/33] | English: | BLACK ICE DETECTION SYSTEM, PROGRAM, AND METHOD | [2018/33] | French: | SYSTÈME, PROGRAMME, ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION DE GLACE NOIRE | [2018/33] | Examination procedure | 10.02.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.03.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/33] | 04.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 28.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 07.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.09.2023 | CZ | 06.09.2023 | DK | 06.09.2023 | EE | 06.09.2023 | ES | 06.09.2023 | FI | 06.09.2023 | HR | 06.09.2023 | IT | 06.09.2023 | LT | 06.09.2023 | LV | 06.09.2023 | NL | 06.09.2023 | PL | 06.09.2023 | RO | 06.09.2023 | RS | 06.09.2023 | SE | 06.09.2023 | SI | 06.09.2023 | SK | 06.09.2023 | SM | 06.09.2023 | NO | 06.12.2023 | GR | 07.12.2023 | IS | 06.01.2024 | PT | 08.01.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/33] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
DK | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
IT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
PL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
IT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
PL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
PL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/14] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 06.09.2023 | |
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2014062725 (MASTON ROBERT A [US]) [A] 4,10 * paragraphs [0046] , [0 59] , [0 73] *; | [I]WO2015034844 (FLIR SYSTEMS [US]) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * page 3 * * page 7 - page 10 * * page 13 * * page 16 * * page 19 - page 20 * * page 26 - page 29 *; | [I]US9465987 (BELL BRIAN [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * column 2 * * column 4 - column 6 * * column 8 - column 9 * * column 11, line 13 - column 11, line 22 *; | [I] - QIAN YIMING ET AL, "Evaluating features and classifiers for road weather condition analysis", 2016 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON IMAGE PROCESSING (ICIP), IEEE, (20160925), doi:10.1109/ICIP.2016.7533192, pages 4403 - 4407, XP033017329 [I] 1-15 * abstract * * section 2, paragraph 1 * * sections 3-4 * * section 5, paragraph 1 * * section 6, last 3 lines * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICIP.2016.7533192 | [A] - BRANDAO MARTIM ET AL, "Material recognition CNNs and hierarchical planning for biped robot locomotion on slippery terrain", 2016 IEEE-RAS 16TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON HUMANOID ROBOTS (HUMANOIDS), IEEE, (20161115), doi:10.1109/HUMANOIDS.2016.7803258, pages 81 - 88, XP033036061 [A] 1,13-15 * abstract * * sections II-III * * section V * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/HUMANOIDS.2016.7803258 | [A] - CIMPOI MIRCEA ET AL, "Deep filter banks for texture recognition and segmentation", 2015 IEEE CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER VISION AND PATTERN RECOGNITION (CVPR), IEEE, (20150607), doi:10.1109/CVPR.2015.7299007, pages 3828 - 3836, XP032793834 [A] 1,13-15 * abstract * * page 3832, column 1, paragraph 2 * * figure 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CVPR.2015.7299007 |