EP3190696 - MOTOR CONTROLLING METHOD AND APPARATUS THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.04.2019 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.02.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.01.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.05.2019 [2019/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daikin Industries, Ltd. Umeda Center Bldg., 4-12, Nakazaka-Nishi 2-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8323 / JP | [2017/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAEDA, Toshiyuki Daikin Air-Conditioning 1000-2, Aza Ootani Okamotcho Kusatsu-shi Shiga, 525-0044 / JP | [2017/28] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2017/28] | Application number, filing date | 17156396.8 | 25.02.2003 | [2017/28] | Priority number, date | JP20020047546 | 25.02.2002 Original published format: JP 2002047546 | [2017/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3190696 | Date: | 12.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H02P6/10, H02P23/00, H02P6/28 | [2017/28] | CPC: |
H02P27/08 (EP,US);
H02P6/10 (KR);
H02P23/0004 (EP,US);
H02P27/045 (EP,US);
H02P6/28 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/08] |
Former [2017/28] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | MOTORSTEUERUNGSVERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG DAFÜR | [2017/28] | English: | MOTOR CONTROLLING METHOD AND APPARATUS THEREOF | [2017/28] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE MOTEUR ET APPAREIL CORRESPONDANT | [2017/28] | Examination procedure | 16.02.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/08] | 11.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.04.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/20] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03742673.1 / EP1480326 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 16.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 16.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 16.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 16.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 16.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 22.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 14.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 13.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 17 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]JP2001037281 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [I] 1-4 * figures 16,18 *; | [A] - BORSTING H ET AL, "ESTIMATION OF MECHANICAL SIGNALS IN INDUCTION MOTORS USING THE RECURSIVE PREDICTION ERROR METHOD", CONTROL IN POWER ELECTRONICS. BRIGHTON, SEPT. 13 - 16, 1993; [PROCEEDINGS OF THE EUROPEAN CONFERENCE ON POWER ELECTRONICS AND APPLICATIONS], LONDON, IEE, GB, (19930913), vol. 4, pages 455 - 460, XP000427117 [A] 1-4 * abstract * | [A] - DU T ET AL, "IMPLEMENTATION OF EXTENDED LUENBERGER OBSERVERS FOR JOINT STATE ANDPARAMETER ESTIMATION OF PWM INDUCTION MOTOR DRIVE", CONTROL IN POWER ELECTRONICS. BRIGHTON, SEPT. 13 - 16, 1993; [PROCEEDINGS OF THE EUROPEAN CONFERENCE ON POWER ELECTRONICS AND APPLICATIONS], LONDON, IEE, GB, (19930913), vol. 4, pages 439 - 444, XP000427114 [A] 1-4 * abstract * |