EP3364562 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR NON-INTRUSIVE DETECTION OF OPTICAL ENERGY LEAKAGE FROM OPTICAL FIBERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.07.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fluke Corporation 6920 Seaway Boulevard Everett, WA 98203 / US | [2018/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHELL, J.D. 15919 Braesgate Drive Austin, TX 78717 / US | 02 /
HITTEL, John P. 5202E Aire Libre Avenue Scottsdale, AZ 85254 / US | 03 /
SALLING, Jackson 5716 Chesterfield Avenue Austin, TX 78752 / US | 04 /
KIM, Wonoh 355 Stedford Lane Johns Creek, GA 30097 / US | [2019/34] |
Former [2018/34] | 01 /
SCHELL, J.D. 15919 Braesgate Drive Austin, TX 78717 / US | ||
02 /
HITTEL, John P. 5202E Aire Libre Avenue Scottsdale, AZ 85254 / US | |||
03 /
SALLING, Jackson 5716 Chesterfield Avenue Austin, TX 78752 / US | |||
04 /
KIM, Wonoh 355 Stedford Lane John Creek, GA 30097 / US | Representative(s) | Hargreaves, Timothy Edward, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 40 Torphichen Street Edinburgh EH3 8JB / GB | [2018/34] | Application number, filing date | 17157253.0 | 21.02.2017 | [2018/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3364562 | Date: | 22.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04B10/077, G01M11/00 | [2018/34] | CPC: |
H04B10/0771 (EP);
G01M11/35 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR NICHTINTRUSIVEN DETEKTION EINES OPTISCHEN ENERGIELECKS VON GLASFASERN | [2018/34] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR NON-INTRUSIVE DETECTION OF OPTICAL ENERGY LEAKAGE FROM OPTICAL FIBERS | [2018/34] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION NON INTRUSIVE DE FUITE D'ÉNERGIE OPTIQUE À PARTIR DE FIBRES OPTIQUES | [2018/34] | Examination procedure | 21.02.2017 | Examination requested [2018/34] | 21.02.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.07.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.12.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/32] | 20.01.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2020 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2014211201 (KIM WONOH [US]) [A] 1-15 * page 1, paragraphs 16-17 * * page 2 - paragraph 32; figures 1,2,8 *; | [A]US2015292938 (GUIMOND STEPHEN J [US]) [A] 1-15 * page 3, paragraph 15 - page 6, paragraph 51; figures 1-6 *; | [A]EP2854307 (FLUKE CORP [US]) [A] 1-15 * page 6, paragraph 20 - page 7, paragraph 23; figures 3,4 * | by applicant | US7826043 | US8880783 | US8810783 |