Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10865652 | Global Dossier | 15.12.2020 | B2 | US2019145271 | 16.05.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201916245691 | 11.01.2019 | US201615052457 | 24.02.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10215043 | Global Dossier | 26.02.2019 | B2 | US2017241281 | 24.08.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615052457 | 24.02.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3211277 | Global Dossier | 06.05.2020 | B1 | EP3211277 | 30.08.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615052457 | 24.02.2016 |