EP3220358 - ELECTRONIC VEHICLE IDENTIFICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.10.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.12.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.03.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.11.2022 [2022/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Accenture Global Services Limited 3 Grand Canal Plaza Grand Canal Street Upper Dublin 4 / IE | [2017/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hedley, Jay E. Suite 1128 1200 North Nash Street Arlington, VA Virginia 22209 / US | 02 /
Thornburg, Neal Patrick 1019 Westbrook Drive Charlotte, NC North Carolina 28202 / US | [2017/38] | Representative(s) | Swindell & Pearson Limited 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/38] | Harrison, Scott David Swindell & Pearson Limited 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | Application number, filing date | 17157581.4 | 12.06.2006 | [2017/38] | Priority number, date | US20050689050P | 10.06.2005 Original published format: US 689050 P | [2017/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3220358 | Date: | 20.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G07B15/06, G08G1/017, G08G1/00 | [2017/38] | CPC: |
G08G1/0175 (EP,US);
G06V20/52 (US);
G06V20/54 (EP,US);
G06V20/588 (US);
G06V20/62 (US);
G06V20/63 (EP,US);
G07B15/00 (US);
G07B15/06 (EP,US);
G07B15/063 (US);
H04N7/188 (US);
G06Q2240/00 (EP,US);
G06Q50/40 (EP,US);
G06V20/625 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/16] |
Former [2017/38] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE FAHRZEUGIDENTIFIZIERUNG | [2017/38] | English: | ELECTRONIC VEHICLE IDENTIFICATION | [2017/38] | French: | IDENTIFICATION ÉLECTRONIQUE DE VÉHICULE | [2017/38] | Examination procedure | 23.02.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.02.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/16] | 21.12.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.08.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.02.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/45] | 01.07.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/45] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06795421.4 / EP1897064 | EP12165404.0 / EP2518695 | EP13173288.5 / EP2642453 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 12.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 13.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 14.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2022 | 17   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2002140577 (KAVNER DOUGLAS M [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0029] ** paragraph [0036] *; | [AD]US6747687 (ALVES JAMES FRANCIS [US]) [AD] 1-15 * abstract * * column 3, line 13 - column 7, line 4 * | by applicant | US6747687 |