EP3366653 - SYSTEM FOR WATER DISINFECTION USING ELECTROPORATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 24.02.2023 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.02.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.08.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.02.2023 | Refusal of application | published on 29.03.2023 [2023/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Geodesic Innovations SL Calle Doctor Esquerdo, 105 28007 Madrid / ES | [2019/01] |
Former [2018/35] | For all designated states Ibanez Botella, Juan Miguel Calle Doctor Esquerdo 105 28007 Madrid / ES | ||
For all designated states Botija Ibanez, Luis Miguel Calle Doctor Esquerdo 105 28007 Madrid / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IBAÑEZ BOTELLA, Juan Miguel Calle Doctor Esquerdo 105 28007 Madrid / ES | 02 /
BOTIJA IBAÑEZ, Luis Miguel Calle Doctor Esquerdo 105 28007 Madrid / ES | [2018/35] | Representative(s) | Lahidalga de Careaga, Jose Luis Arturo Soria, 243 Dupl. 28033 Madrid / ES | [2018/35] | Application number, filing date | 17157605.1 | 23.02.2017 | [2018/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3366653 | Date: | 29.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.04.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C02F1/469, C25B11/04, // C02F1/461 | [2018/35] | CPC: |
C02F1/4696 (EP,US);
C02F1/46109 (US);
C25B11/04 (EP);
C25B11/043 (EP,US);
C25B9/77 (EP,US);
C02F2001/46128 (EP,US);
C02F2001/46142 (EP);
C02F2201/4613 (EP);
C02F2201/4617 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/39] |
Former [2018/35] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM FÜR WASSERDESINFEKTION DURCH ELEKTROPORATION | [2018/35] | English: | SYSTEM FOR WATER DISINFECTION USING ELECTROPORATION | [2018/35] | French: | SYSTÈME DE DÉSINFECTION D'EAU À L'AIDE D'UNE ÉLECTROPORATION | [2018/35] | Examination procedure | 23.02.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.08.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.08.2018 | Examination requested [2018/39] | 28.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.07.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 29.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2022 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 05.10.2022 | 05.10.2022 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 10.11.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2023/13] | 20.11.2022 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2023/13] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 29.09.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 29.09.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.10.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2019 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   23.05.2019 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2005072675 (DUDZIAK GREGOR [DE], et al) [A] 3 * paragraph [0027] *; | [A]EP1694604 (AKZO NOBEL NV [NL], et al) [A] 8,11* paragraphs [0022] , [0049] *; | [I]EP1741675 (ADEPT WATER TECHNOLOGIES AS [DK]) [I] 1-11 * paragraphs [0008] - [0012]; figure 1 *; | [I]WO2009128573 (KWANGSAN CO LTD [KR], et al) [I] 1-11 * paragraphs [0027] , [0034] , [0035] , [0048]; figures 1-3,7 *; | [XI]US2017029300 (YEUNG KING LUN [CN], et al) [X] 1,4-6,12 * paragraphs [0002] , [0016] - [0019] - [0032] , [0057] - [0066] - [0100] - [0101] - [0130] , [0133] - [0135] - [0149] , [0195] - [0196]; figures 1,13,14,17d * [I] 2,3,7-11 | by applicant | EP1969159 | ES2395586 |