Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023321019 | ![]() | 12.10.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201815992979 | 30.05.2018 | US202016863459 | 30.04.2020 | US17951109 | 19.05.2009 | US83613010 | 14.07.2010 | US202217985556 | 11.11.2022 | US78135710 | 17.05.2010 | US201514789214 | 01.07.2015 | US96153410 | 07.12.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2021077442 | ![]() | 18.03.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201815992979 | 30.05.2018 | US202016863459 | 30.04.2020 | US17951109 | 19.05.2009 | US83613010 | 14.07.2010 | US78135710 | 17.05.2010 | US201514789214 | 01.07.2015 | US96153410 | 07.12.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2019125708 | ![]() | 02.05.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201815992979 | 30.05.2018 | US17951109 | 19.05.2009 | US83613010 | 14.07.2010 | US78135710 | 17.05.2010 | US201514789214 | 01.07.2015 | US96153410 | 07.12.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2017196828 | ![]() | 13.07.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313796232 | 12.03.2013 | US17951109 | 19.05.2009 | US83613010 | 14.07.2010 | US78135710 | 17.05.2010 | US96153410 | 07.12.2010 | US201615244326 | 23.08.2016 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9993451 | ![]() | 12.06.2018 | B2 | US2016151317 | 02.06.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US17951109 | 19.05.2009 | US83613010 | 14.07.2010 | US78135710 | 17.05.2010 | US201514789214 | 01.07.2015 | US96153410 | 07.12.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9040590 | ![]() | 26.05.2015 | B2 | US2014249231 | 04.09.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414276235 | 13.05.2014 | US17951109 | 19.05.2009 | US83613010 | 14.07.2010 | US78135710 | 17.05.2010 | US96153410 | 07.12.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9040589 | ![]() | 26.05.2015 | B2 | US2014249230 | 04.09.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414276211 | 13.05.2014 | US17951109 | 19.05.2009 | US83613010 | 14.07.2010 | US78135710 | 17.05.2010 | US96153410 | 07.12.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2013253056 | ![]() | 26.09.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313796232 | 12.03.2013 | US17951109 | 19.05.2009 | US83613010 | 14.07.2010 | US78135710 | 17.05.2010 | US96153410 | 07.12.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9101663 | ![]() | 11.08.2015 | B2 | US2011269833 | 03.11.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US17951109 | 19.05.2009 | US83613010 | 14.07.2010 | US78135710 | 17.05.2010 | US96153410 | 07.12.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7863336 | ![]() | 04.01.2011 | B2 | US2010298429 | 25.11.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US17951109 | 19.05.2009 | US83613010 | 14.07.2010 | US78135710 | 17.05.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8193243 | ![]() | 05.06.2012 | B2 | US2010298428 | 25.11.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US17951109 | 19.05.2009 | US78135710 | 17.05.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101709904B | ![]() | 23.02.2017 | B1 | KR20160091424 | 02.08.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US17951109 | 19.05.2009 | WO2010IL00400 | 17.05.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5643297B | ![]() | 17.12.2014 | B2 | JP2012527447 | 08.11.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US17951109 | 19.05.2009 | WO2010IL00400 | 17.05.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL243818 | ![]() | 29.12.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | IL24381816 | 28.01.2016 | US17951109 | 19.05.2009 | WO2010IL00400 | 17.05.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL216383 | ![]() | 29.02.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US17951109 | 19.05.2009 | WO2010IL00400 | 17.05.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3777839 | ![]() | 17.02.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US17951109 | 19.05.2009 | EP17158360 | 17.05.2010 | EP10725880 | 17.05.2010 | WO2010IL00400 | 17.05.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2432454 | ![]() | 01.03.2017 | B1 | EP2432454 | 28.03.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US17951109 | 19.05.2009 | WO2010IL00400 | 17.05.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104546700B | ![]() | 06.06.2017 | B | CN104546700 | 29.04.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201080022208 | 17.05.2010 | US17951109 | 19.05.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102438587B | ![]() | 19.08.2015 | B | CN102438587 | 02.05.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US17951109 | 19.05.2009 | WO2010IL00400 | 17.05.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2761624 | ![]() | 18.10.2016 | C | CA2761624 | 25.11.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US17951109 | 19.05.2009 | WO2010IL00400 | 17.05.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2010250766B | ![]() | 09.04.2015 | B2 | AU2010250766 | 12.01.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US17951109 | 19.05.2009 | WO2010IL00400 | 17.05.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3192500 | ![]() | 02.12.2020 | B1 | EP3192500 | 19.07.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US17951109 | 19.05.2009 | EP10725880 | 17.05.2010 | WO2010IL00400 | 17.05.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI1011031 | 25.05.2021 | B8 | BRPI1011031 | 23.06.2020 | B1 | BRPI1011031 | 16.08.2016 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US17951109 | 19.05.2009 | WO2010IL00400 | 17.05.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CY1119495T | 07.03.2018 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US17951109 | 19.05.2009 | WO2010IL00400 | 17.05.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2432454T | 19.06.2017 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US17951109 | 19.05.2009 | WO2010IL00400 | 17.05.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK3192500T | 21.12.2020 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US17951109 | 19.05.2009 | EP10725880 | 17.05.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2627655T | 31.07.2017 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US17951109 | 19.05.2009 | WO2010IL00400 | 17.05.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HRP20170805T | 25.08.2017 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US17951109 | 19.05.2009 | EP10725880 | 17.05.2010 | WO2010IL00400 | 17.05.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HRP20202038T | 05.03.2021 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US17951109 | 19.05.2009 | EP17158360 | 17.05.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | LT2432454T | 10.07.2017 | T | Priority number | Date | US17951109 | 19.05.2009 | WO2010IL00400 | 17.05.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2011012315 | 16.12.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US17951109 | 19.05.2009 | WO2010IL00400 | 17.05.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX364974 | 16.05.2019 | B | Priority number | Date | US17951109 | 19.05.2009 | WO2010IL00400 | 17.05.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ596963 | 31.01.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US17951109 | 19.05.2009 | WO2010IL00400 | 17.05.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL2432454T | 31.10.2017 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US17951109 | 19.05.2009 | EP10725880 | 17.05.2010 | WO2010IL00400 | 17.05.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL3192500T | 06.04.2021 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US17951109 | 19.05.2009 | EP17158360 | 17.05.2010 | EP10725880 | 17.05.2010 | WO2010IL00400 | 17.05.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2559083 | 20.01.2016 | C9 | RU2559083 | 10.08.2015 | C2 | RU2011149976 | 27.06.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US17951109 | 19.05.2009 | WO2010IL00400 | 17.05.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG176159 | 29.12.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US17951109 | 19.05.2009 | WO2010IL00400 | 17.05.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI2432454T | 29.09.2017 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US17951109 | 19.05.2009 | EP10725880 | 17.05.2010 | WO2010IL00400 | 17.05.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA201109037 | 27.02.2013 | B | Priority number | Date | US17951109 | 19.05.2009 | WO2010IL00400 | 17.05.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010134074 | ![]() | 25.11.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US17951109 | 19.05.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101641401B | ![]() | 20.07.2016 | B1 | KR20120027371 | 21.03.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US17951109 | 19.05.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6157678B | ![]() | 05.07.2017 | B2 | JP2016121199 | 07.07.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US17951109 | 19.05.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5921002B | ![]() | 24.05.2016 | B2 | JP2015017144 | 29.01.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US17951109 | 19.05.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR078413 | 09.11.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US17951109 | 19.05.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR117412 | 04.08.2021 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US17951109 | 19.05.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR117502 | 11.08.2021 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US17951109 | 19.05.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CL2011002895 | 12.10.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US17951109 | 19.05.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2840748T | 07.07.2021 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US17951109 | 19.05.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUE033388T | 28.12.2017 | T2 | Priority number | Date | US17951109 | 19.05.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUE052685T | 28.05.2021 | T2 | Priority number | Date | US17951109 | 19.05.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT2432454T | 12.06.2017 | T | Priority number | Date | US17951109 | 19.05.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT3192500T | 05.01.2021 | T | Priority number | Date | US17951109 | 19.05.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2678839 | 04.02.2019 | C2 | RU2015115064 | 20.11.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US17951109 | 19.05.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2019101159 | 16.07.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | US17951109 | 19.05.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG10201505101V | 30.07.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US17951109 | 19.05.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG10201709016R | 29.11.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US17951109 | 19.05.2009 | Type | ![]() | EP3777839 | Type | ![]() | EP2432454 |