Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
12.07.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.08.2019 [2019/33] |
05.04.2019 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
17.03.2019 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
27.07.2018 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 29.08.2018 [2018/35] |