Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11258437 | Global Dossier | 22.02.2022 | B2 | US2021135664 | 06.05.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP17158392 | 28.02.2017 | WO2018EP54775 | 27.02.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102227376B | Global Dossier | 11.03.2021 | B1 | KR20190121829 | 28.10.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | EP17158392 | 28.02.2017 | WO2018EP54775 | 27.02.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3571766 | Global Dossier | 15.11.2023 | B8 | EP3571766 | Global Dossier | 11.10.2023 | C0 | EP3571766 | 11.10.2023 | B1 | EP3571766 | 27.11.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP17158392 | 28.02.2017 | WO2018EP54775 | 27.02.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN110352558B | Global Dossier | 28.07.2023 | B | CN110352558 | 18.10.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | EP17158392 | 28.02.2017 | WO2018EP54775 | 27.02.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2018227938B | Global Dossier | 15.10.2020 | B2 | AU2018227938 | 22.08.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP17158392 | 28.02.2017 | WO2018EP54775 | 27.02.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2018158233 | Global Dossier | 07.09.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP17158392 | 28.02.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3367567 | Global Dossier | 29.08.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP17158392 | 28.02.2017 |