Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2016073261 | Global Dossier | 12.05.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414534766 | 06.11.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2012149248 | Global Dossier | 01.11.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113095983 | 28.04.2011 | US201213451248 | 19.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2012149079 | Global Dossier | 24.01.2013 | A3 | WO2012149079 | 01.11.2012 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201213454490 | 24.04.2012 | US201213454913 | 24.04.2012 | US201113095983 | 28.04.2011 | US201213454716 | 24.04.2012 | US201213454670 | 24.04.2012 | US201213454876 | 24.04.2012 | US201213454833 | 24.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2012148731 | Global Dossier | 01.11.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113095983 | 28.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2018103604 | Global Dossier | 19.04.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213454490 | 24.04.2012 | US201113095983 | 28.04.2011 | US201615370210 | 06.12.2016 | US201414331367 | 15.07.2014 | US201715841418 | 14.12.2017 | US201715634457 | 27.06.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2018064062 | Global Dossier | 08.03.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514727984 | 02.06.2015 | US201113095983 | 28.04.2011 | US201715641424 | 05.07.2017 | US201715810774 | 13.11.2017 | US201514963314 | 09.12.2015 | US201213451248 | 19.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9883654 | Global Dossier | 06.02.2018 | B2 | US2017295749 | 19.10.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514727984 | 02.06.2015 | US201113095983 | 28.04.2011 | US201715641424 | 05.07.2017 | US201514963314 | 09.12.2015 | US201213451248 | 19.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2017295744 | Global Dossier | 19.10.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414184206 | 19.02.2014 | US201213449162 | 17.04.2012 | US201113095983 | 28.04.2011 | US201514921350 | 23.10.2015 | US201615098840 | 14.04.2016 | US201715638497 | 30.06.2017 | US201615218601 | 25.07.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9901067 | Global Dossier | 27.02.2018 | B2 | US2017290287 | 12.10.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213454490 | 24.04.2012 | US201113095983 | 28.04.2011 | US201615370210 | 06.12.2016 | US201414331367 | 15.07.2014 | US201715634457 | 27.06.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9737039 | Global Dossier | 22.08.2017 | B2 | US2017079233 | 23.03.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213454490 | 24.04.2012 | US201113095983 | 28.04.2011 | US201615370210 | 06.12.2016 | US201414331367 | 15.07.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9686960 | Global Dossier | 27.06.2017 | B2 | US2017042109 | 16.02.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213454913 | 24.04.2012 | US201113095983 | 28.04.2011 | US201615333301 | 25.10.2016 | US201615068718 | 14.03.2016 | US201414331819 | 15.07.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9980459 | Global Dossier | 29.05.2018 | B2 | US2017020100 | 26.01.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113095983 | 28.04.2011 | US201615289446 | 10.10.2016 | US201213449105 | 17.04.2012 | US201514842906 | 02.09.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9737042 | Global Dossier | 22.08.2017 | B2 | US2016374304 | 29.12.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414184206 | 19.02.2014 | US201113095983 | 28.04.2011 | US201213449162 | 17.04.2012 | US201615097509 | 13.04.2016 | US201514921350 | 23.10.2015 | US201615257952 | 07.09.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9743635 | Global Dossier | 29.08.2017 | B2 | US2016360722 | 15.12.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414184206 | 19.02.2014 | US201113095983 | 28.04.2011 | US201213449162 | 17.04.2012 | US201514921350 | 23.10.2015 | US201615245254 | 24.08.2016 | US201615099510 | 14.04.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9930861 | Global Dossier | 03.04.2018 | B2 | US2016353699 | 08.12.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113095983 | 28.04.2011 | US201514982044 | 29.12.2015 | US201213454876 | 24.04.2012 | US201615239992 | 18.08.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9737041 | Global Dossier | 22.08.2017 | B2 | US2016330927 | 17.11.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414184206 | 19.02.2014 | US201113095983 | 28.04.2011 | US201213449162 | 17.04.2012 | US201514921350 | 23.10.2015 | US201615098840 | 14.04.2016 | US201615218601 | 25.07.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9763422 | Global Dossier | 19.09.2017 | B2 | US2016262336 | 15.09.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113095983 | 28.04.2011 | US201615162815 | 24.05.2016 | US201514727921 | 02.06.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9686959 | Global Dossier | 27.06.2017 | B2 | US2016235030 | 18.08.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113095983 | 28.04.2011 | US201213454716 | 24.04.2012 | US201615135608 | 22.04.2016 | US201414178750 | 12.02.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9648840 | Global Dossier | 16.05.2017 | B2 | US2016235029 | 18.08.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615137058 | 25.04.2016 | US201113095983 | 28.04.2011 | US201514940851 | 13.11.2015 | US201213448882 | 17.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9615537 | Global Dossier | 11.04.2017 | B2 | US2016235028 | 18.08.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113095983 | 28.04.2011 | US201615136460 | 22.04.2016 | US201514921066 | 23.10.2015 | US201213448993 | 17.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9681635 | Global Dossier | 20.06.2017 | B2 | US2016235027 | 18.08.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113095983 | 28.04.2011 | US201615135695 | 22.04.2016 | US201213454716 | 24.04.2012 | US201414178750 | 12.02.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9648841 | Global Dossier | 16.05.2017 | B2 | US2016219827 | 04.08.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113095983 | 28.04.2011 | US201213449173 | 17.04.2012 | US201615095632 | 11.04.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9485955 | Global Dossier | 08.11.2016 | B2 | US2016219826 | 04.08.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414184206 | 19.02.2014 | US201113095983 | 28.04.2011 | US201213449162 | 17.04.2012 | US201514921350 | 23.10.2015 | US201615099510 | 14.04.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9439390 | Global Dossier | 13.09.2016 | B2 | US2016219825 | 04.08.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414184206 | 19.02.2014 | US201113095983 | 28.04.2011 | US201213449162 | 17.04.2012 | US201514921350 | 23.10.2015 | US201615098840 | 14.04.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9468188 | Global Dossier | 18.10.2016 | B2 | US2016219824 | 04.08.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414184206 | 19.02.2014 | US201113095983 | 28.04.2011 | US201213449162 | 17.04.2012 | US201615097509 | 13.04.2016 | US201514921350 | 23.10.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9504224 | Global Dossier | 29.11.2016 | B2 | US2016192610 | 07.07.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213454913 | 24.04.2012 | US201113095983 | 28.04.2011 | US201615068718 | 14.03.2016 | US201414331819 | 15.07.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9474246 | Global Dossier | 25.10.2016 | B2 | US2016113227 | 28.04.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113095983 | 28.04.2011 | US201514982044 | 29.12.2015 | US201213454876 | 24.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9737048 | Global Dossier | 22.08.2017 | B2 | US2016088814 | 31.03.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514727984 | 02.06.2015 | US201113095983 | 28.04.2011 | US201514963314 | 09.12.2015 | US201213451248 | 19.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9374976 | Global Dossier | 28.06.2016 | B2 | US2016066530 | 10.03.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113095983 | 28.04.2011 | US201514940851 | 13.11.2015 | US201213448882 | 17.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9374975 | Global Dossier | 28.06.2016 | B2 | US2016044887 | 18.02.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414184206 | 19.02.2014 | US201113095983 | 28.04.2011 | US201213449162 | 17.04.2012 | US201514921350 | 23.10.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9374979 | Global Dossier | 28.06.2016 | B2 | US2016037746 | 11.02.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113095983 | 28.04.2011 | US201514921066 | 23.10.2015 | US201213448993 | 17.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9491924 | Global Dossier | 15.11.2016 | B2 | US2015373943 | 31.12.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113095983 | 28.04.2011 | US201213449105 | 17.04.2012 | US201514842906 | 02.09.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9282720 | Global Dossier | 15.03.2016 | B2 | US2015257359 | 17.09.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514727984 | 02.06.2015 | US201113095983 | 28.04.2011 | US201213451248 | 19.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9402365 | Global Dossier | 02.08.2016 | B2 | US2015257356 | 17.09.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113095983 | 28.04.2011 | US201514727921 | 02.06.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9326480 | Global Dossier | 03.05.2016 | B2 | US2014326187 | 06.11.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113095983 | 28.04.2011 | US201213454913 | 24.04.2012 | US201414331819 | 15.07.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9549529 | Global Dossier | 24.01.2017 | B2 | US2014318458 | 30.10.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113095983 | 28.04.2011 | US201213454490 | 24.04.2012 | US201414331367 | 15.07.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9480236 | Global Dossier | 01.11.2016 | B2 | US2014216349 | 07.08.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113095983 | 28.04.2011 | US201213448951 | 17.04.2012 | US201414244490 | 03.04.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9253959 | Global Dossier | 09.02.2016 | B2 | US2014165916 | 19.06.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414184206 | 19.02.2014 | US201113095983 | 28.04.2011 | US201213449162 | 17.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9374974 | Global Dossier | 28.06.2016 | B2 | US2014158052 | 12.06.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113095983 | 28.04.2011 | US201213454716 | 24.04.2012 | US201414178750 | 12.02.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9161512 | Global Dossier | 20.10.2015 | B2 | US2012275894 | 01.11.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113095983 | 28.04.2011 | US201213449105 | 17.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9357744 | Global Dossier | 07.06.2016 | B2 | US2012273006 | 01.11.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113095983 | 28.04.2011 | US201213449173 | 17.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8826858 | Global Dossier | 09.09.2014 | B2 | US2012272917 | 01.11.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113095983 | 28.04.2011 | US201213454913 | 24.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9049843 | Global Dossier | 09.06.2015 | B2 | US2012272916 | 01.11.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113095983 | 28.04.2011 | US201213449142 | 17.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9043988 | Global Dossier | 02.06.2015 | B2 | US2012272915 | 01.11.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113095983 | 28.04.2011 | US201213449056 | 17.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9258975 | Global Dossier | 16.02.2016 | B2 | US2012272914 | 01.11.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113095983 | 28.04.2011 | US201213448882 | 17.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9107379 | Global Dossier | 18.08.2015 | B2 | US2012272913 | 01.11.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113095983 | 28.04.2011 | US201213451248 | 19.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9215861 | Global Dossier | 22.12.2015 | B2 | US2012272912 | 01.11.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113095983 | 28.04.2011 | US201213448993 | 17.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9282718 | Global Dossier | 15.03.2016 | B2 | US2012272910 | 01.11.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113095983 | 28.04.2011 | US201213454876 | 24.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8393296 | Global Dossier | 12.03.2013 | B2 | US2012272909 | 01.11.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113095983 | 28.04.2011 | US201213454833 | 24.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8651051 | Global Dossier | 18.02.2014 | B2 | US2012272908 | 01.11.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113095983 | 28.04.2011 | US201213454716 | 24.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9756830 | Global Dossier | 12.09.2017 | B2 | US2012272907 | 01.11.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113095983 | 28.04.2011 | US201213454670 | 24.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8813680 | Global Dossier | 26.08.2014 | B2 | US2012272906 | 01.11.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113095983 | 28.04.2011 | US201213454490 | 24.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8683946 | Global Dossier | 01.04.2014 | B2 | US2012272905 | 01.11.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113095983 | 28.04.2011 | US201213449162 | 17.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8746176 | Global Dossier | 10.06.2014 | B2 | US2012272904 | 01.11.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113095983 | 28.04.2011 | US201213448951 | 17.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9107378 | Global Dossier | 18.08.2015 | B2 | US2012272902 | 01.11.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113095983 | 28.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11096370 | Global Dossier | 24.08.2021 | B2 | US2018228115 | 16.08.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113095983 | 28.04.2011 | US201615289446 | 10.10.2016 | US201213449105 | 17.04.2012 | US201514842906 | 02.09.2015 | US201815950560 | 11.04.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10602712 | Global Dossier | 31.03.2020 | B2 | US2015181829 | 02.07.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113095983 | 28.04.2011 | US201514644784 | 11.03.2015 | US201213449056 | 17.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10477826 | Global Dossier | 19.11.2019 | B2 | US2017245454 | 31.08.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113095983 | 28.04.2011 | US201615135695 | 22.04.2016 | US201213454716 | 24.04.2012 | US201414178750 | 12.02.2014 | US201715596792 | 16.05.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10362759 | Global Dossier | 30.07.2019 | B2 | US2018160645 | 14.06.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113095983 | 28.04.2011 | US201815895473 | 13.02.2018 | US201514982044 | 29.12.2015 | US201213454876 | 24.04.2012 | US201615239992 | 18.08.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10357015 | Global Dossier | 23.07.2019 | B2 | US2015059649 | 05.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113095983 | 28.04.2011 | US201414534766 | 06.11.2014 | US201213449105 | 17.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10349618 | Global Dossier | 16.07.2019 | B2 | US2019090449 | 28.03.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113095983 | 28.04.2011 | US201615274213 | 23.09.2016 | US201816206839 | 30.11.2018 | US201213448951 | 17.04.2012 | US201414244490 | 03.04.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10172320 | Global Dossier | 08.01.2019 | B2 | US2017006818 | 12.01.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113095983 | 28.04.2011 | US201615274213 | 23.09.2016 | US201213448951 | 17.04.2012 | US201414244490 | 03.04.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10143179 | Global Dossier | 04.12.2018 | B2 | US2015189850 | 09.07.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113095983 | 28.04.2011 | US201514663072 | 19.03.2015 | US201213449142 | 17.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3424307 | Global Dossier | 09.02.2022 | B1 | EP3424307 | 20.03.2019 | A3 | EP3424307 | 09.01.2019 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201113095983 | 28.04.2011 | WO2012US33892 | 17.04.2012 | EP12716985 | 17.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3400792 | Global Dossier | 11.03.2020 | B1 | EP3400792 | 14.11.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012US35356 | 27.04.2012 | US201113095983 | 28.04.2011 | EP12718865 | 27.04.2012 | US201213451248 | 19.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3245866 | Global Dossier | 14.02.2024 | B2 | EP3245866 | 15.07.2020 | B1 | EP3245866 | 22.11.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP12719210 | 26.04.2012 | US201213449162 | 17.04.2012 | US201113095983 | 28.04.2011 | US201213449173 | 17.04.2012 | US201213449142 | 17.04.2012 | WO2012US35107 | 26.04.2012 | US201213448993 | 17.04.2012 | US201213448951 | 17.04.2012 | US201213449105 | 17.04.2012 | US201213449056 | 17.04.2012 | US201213448882 | 17.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3222136 | Global Dossier | 21.08.2019 | B1 | EP3222136 | 27.09.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213454490 | 24.04.2012 | US201213454913 | 24.04.2012 | US201113095983 | 28.04.2011 | US201213454716 | 24.04.2012 | EP12718850 | 26.04.2012 | US201213454670 | 24.04.2012 | US201213454876 | 24.04.2012 | US201213454833 | 24.04.2012 | WO2012US35079 | 26.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3214924 | Global Dossier | 29.04.2020 | B1 | EP3214924 | 13.09.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414534766 | 06.11.2014 | WO2015US57931 | 29.10.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3202259 | Global Dossier | 04.11.2020 | B1 | EP3202259 | 09.08.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP12719210 | 26.04.2012 | US201213449162 | 17.04.2012 | US201113095983 | 28.04.2011 | US201213449173 | 17.04.2012 | US201213449142 | 17.04.2012 | WO2012US35107 | 26.04.2012 | US201213448993 | 17.04.2012 | US201213448951 | 17.04.2012 | US201213449105 | 17.04.2012 | US201213449056 | 17.04.2012 | US201213448882 | 17.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3202258 | Global Dossier | 09.08.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP12719210 | 26.04.2012 | US201213449162 | 17.04.2012 | US201113095983 | 28.04.2011 | US201213449173 | 17.04.2012 | US201213449142 | 17.04.2012 | US201213448993 | 17.04.2012 | US201213448951 | 17.04.2012 | US201213449105 | 17.04.2012 | US201213449056 | 17.04.2012 | US201213448882 | 17.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3202257 | Global Dossier | 15.04.2020 | B1 | EP3202257 | 09.08.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP12719210 | 26.04.2012 | US201213449162 | 17.04.2012 | US201113095983 | 28.04.2011 | US201213449173 | 17.04.2012 | US201213449142 | 17.04.2012 | WO2012US35107 | 26.04.2012 | US201213448993 | 17.04.2012 | US201213448951 | 17.04.2012 | US201213449105 | 17.04.2012 | US201213449056 | 17.04.2012 | US201213448882 | 17.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3202256 | Global Dossier | 09.08.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP12719210 | 26.04.2012 | US201213449162 | 17.04.2012 | US201113095983 | 28.04.2011 | US201213449173 | 17.04.2012 | US201213449142 | 17.04.2012 | US201213448993 | 17.04.2012 | US201213448951 | 17.04.2012 | US201213449105 | 17.04.2012 | US201213449056 | 17.04.2012 | US201213448882 | 17.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3202255 | Global Dossier | 16.08.2023 | B2 | EP3202255 | 01.04.2020 | B1 | EP3202255 | 09.08.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP12719210 | 26.04.2012 | US201213449162 | 17.04.2012 | US201113095983 | 28.04.2011 | US201213449173 | 17.04.2012 | US201213449142 | 17.04.2012 | WO2012US35107 | 26.04.2012 | US201213448993 | 17.04.2012 | US201213448951 | 17.04.2012 | US201213449105 | 17.04.2012 | US201213449056 | 17.04.2012 | US201213448882 | 17.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2701494 | Global Dossier | 29.03.2017 | B1 | EP2701494 | 05.03.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213449162 | 17.04.2012 | US201113095983 | 28.04.2011 | US201213449173 | 17.04.2012 | US201213449142 | 17.04.2012 | WO2012US35107 | 26.04.2012 | US201213448993 | 17.04.2012 | US201213448951 | 17.04.2012 | US201213449105 | 17.04.2012 | US201213449056 | 17.04.2012 | US201213448882 | 17.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2701492 | Global Dossier | 07.06.2017 | B1 | EP2701492 | 05.03.2014 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201213454490 | 24.04.2012 | US201213454913 | 24.04.2012 | US201113095983 | 28.04.2011 | US201213454716 | 24.04.2012 | US201213454670 | 24.04.2012 | US201213454876 | 24.04.2012 | US201213454833 | 24.04.2012 | WO2012US35079 | 26.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2701490 | Global Dossier | 29.08.2018 | B1 | EP2701490 | 05.03.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012US35356 | 27.04.2012 | US201113095983 | 28.04.2011 | US201213451248 | 19.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2701489 | Global Dossier | 06.06.2018 | B1 | EP2701489 | 05.03.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113095983 | 28.04.2011 | WO2012US33892 | 17.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3029956 | Global Dossier | 07.04.2020 | C | CA3029956 | 12.05.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA2965985 | 29.10.2015 | US201414534766 | 06.11.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2965985 | Global Dossier | 09.07.2019 | C | CA2965985 | 12.05.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414534766 | 06.11.2014 | WO2015US57931 | 29.10.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2928689 | Global Dossier | 23.05.2017 | C | CA2928689 | 04.07.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213449162 | 17.04.2012 | US201113095983 | 28.04.2011 | US201213449173 | 17.04.2012 | US201213449142 | 17.04.2012 | CA2913433 | 27.04.2012 | US201213448993 | 17.04.2012 | US201213448951 | 17.04.2012 | US201213449105 | 17.04.2012 | US201213449056 | 17.04.2012 | US201213448882 | 17.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2928688 | Global Dossier | 15.11.2016 | C | CA2928688 | 04.07.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213449162 | 17.04.2012 | US201113095983 | 28.04.2011 | US201213449173 | 17.04.2012 | US201213449142 | 17.04.2012 | CA2913433 | 27.04.2012 | US201213448993 | 17.04.2012 | US201213448951 | 17.04.2012 | US201213449105 | 17.04.2012 | US201213449056 | 17.04.2012 | US201213448882 | 17.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2921018 | Global Dossier | 17.01.2017 | C | CA2921018 | 03.07.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213454490 | 24.04.2012 | US201213454913 | 24.04.2012 | US201113095983 | 28.04.2011 | US201213454716 | 24.04.2012 | US201213454670 | 24.04.2012 | CA2893411 | 27.04.2012 | US201213454876 | 24.04.2012 | US201213454833 | 24.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2921014 | Global Dossier | 11.10.2016 | C | CA2921014 | 03.07.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213454490 | 24.04.2012 | US201213454913 | 24.04.2012 | US201113095983 | 28.04.2011 | US201213454716 | 24.04.2012 | US201213454670 | 24.04.2012 | CA2893411 | 27.04.2012 | US201213454876 | 24.04.2012 | US201213454833 | 24.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2913440 | Global Dossier | 14.06.2016 | C | CA2913440 | 04.07.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213449162 | 17.04.2012 | US201113095983 | 28.04.2011 | US201213449173 | 17.04.2012 | US201213449142 | 17.04.2012 | CA2891987 | 27.04.2012 | US201213448993 | 17.04.2012 | US201213448951 | 17.04.2012 | US201213449105 | 17.04.2012 | US201213449056 | 17.04.2012 | US201213448882 | 17.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2913434 | Global Dossier | 19.07.2016 | C | CA2913434 | 04.07.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213449162 | 17.04.2012 | US201113095983 | 28.04.2011 | US201213449173 | 17.04.2012 | US201213449142 | 17.04.2012 | CA2891987 | 27.04.2012 | US201213448993 | 17.04.2012 | US201213448951 | 17.04.2012 | US201213449105 | 17.04.2012 | US201213449056 | 17.04.2012 | US201213448882 | 17.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2913433 | Global Dossier | 19.07.2016 | C | CA2913433 | 04.07.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213449162 | 17.04.2012 | US201113095983 | 28.04.2011 | US201213449173 | 17.04.2012 | US201213449142 | 17.04.2012 | CA2891987 | 27.04.2012 | US201213448993 | 17.04.2012 | US201213448951 | 17.04.2012 | US201213449105 | 17.04.2012 | US201213449056 | 17.04.2012 | US201213448882 | 17.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2893411 | Global Dossier | 14.06.2016 | C | CA2893411 | 03.07.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213454490 | 24.04.2012 | US201213454913 | 24.04.2012 | US201113095983 | 28.04.2011 | US201213454716 | 24.04.2012 | US201213454670 | 24.04.2012 | CA2868647 | 27.04.2012 | US201213454876 | 24.04.2012 | US201213454833 | 24.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2891987 | Global Dossier | 09.02.2016 | C | CA2891987 | 04.07.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213449162 | 17.04.2012 | US201113095983 | 28.04.2011 | US201213449173 | 17.04.2012 | CA2829924 | 27.04.2012 | US201213449142 | 17.04.2012 | US201213448993 | 17.04.2012 | US201213448951 | 17.04.2012 | US201213449105 | 17.04.2012 | US201213449056 | 17.04.2012 | US201213448882 | 17.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2829659 | Global Dossier | 29.12.2015 | C | CA2829659 | 04.07.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213449162 | 17.04.2012 | US201113095983 | 28.04.2011 | US201213449173 | 17.04.2012 | CA2775177 | 27.04.2012 | US201213449142 | 17.04.2012 | US201213448993 | 17.04.2012 | US201213448951 | 17.04.2012 | US201213449105 | 17.04.2012 | US201213449056 | 17.04.2012 | US201213448882 | 17.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2829657 | Global Dossier | 20.10.2015 | C | CA2829657 | 04.07.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213449162 | 17.04.2012 | US201113095983 | 28.04.2011 | US201213449173 | 17.04.2012 | CA2775177 | 27.04.2012 | US201213449142 | 17.04.2012 | US201213448993 | 17.04.2012 | US201213448951 | 17.04.2012 | US201213449105 | 17.04.2012 | US201213449056 | 17.04.2012 | US201213448882 | 17.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2018200315B | Global Dossier | 12.09.2019 | B2 | AU2018200315 | 01.02.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414534766 | 06.11.2014 | WO2015US57931 | 29.10.2015 | AU2015343473 | 29.10.2015 | AU2018200315 | 15.01.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2015343473B | Global Dossier | 14.12.2017 | B2 | AU2015343473 | 18.05.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414534766 | 06.11.2014 | WO2015US57931 | 29.10.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3202254 | Global Dossier | 22.04.2020 | B1 | EP3202254 | 09.08.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP12719210 | 26.04.2012 | US201213449162 | 17.04.2012 | US201113095983 | 28.04.2011 | US201213449173 | 17.04.2012 | US201213449142 | 17.04.2012 | WO2012US35107 | 26.04.2012 | US201213448993 | 17.04.2012 | US201213448951 | 17.04.2012 | US201213449105 | 17.04.2012 | US201213449056 | 17.04.2012 | US201213448882 | 17.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2775132 | 06.08.2013 | C | CA2775132 | 03.07.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213454490 | 24.04.2012 | US201213454913 | 24.04.2012 | US201113095983 | 28.04.2011 | US201213454716 | 24.04.2012 | US201213454670 | 24.04.2012 | US201213454876 | 24.04.2012 | US201213454833 | 24.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2775252 | 24.12.2013 | C | CA2775252 | 04.07.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113095983 | 28.04.2011 | US201213451248 | 19.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2817043 | 15.07.2014 | C | CA2817043 | 03.07.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213454490 | 24.04.2012 | US201213454913 | 24.04.2012 | US201113095983 | 28.04.2011 | CA2775132 | 27.04.2012 | US201213454716 | 24.04.2012 | US201213454670 | 24.04.2012 | US201213454876 | 24.04.2012 | US201213454833 | 24.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2829656 | 14.07.2015 | C | CA2829656 | 04.07.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213449162 | 17.04.2012 | US201113095983 | 28.04.2011 | US201213449173 | 17.04.2012 | CA2775177 | 27.04.2012 | US201213449142 | 17.04.2012 | US201213448993 | 17.04.2012 | US201213448951 | 17.04.2012 | US201213449105 | 17.04.2012 | US201213449056 | 17.04.2012 | US201213448882 | 17.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2829924 | 18.08.2015 | C | CA2829924 | 04.07.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213449162 | 17.04.2012 | US201113095983 | 28.04.2011 | US201213449173 | 17.04.2012 | CA2775177 | 27.04.2012 | US201213449142 | 17.04.2012 | US201213448993 | 17.04.2012 | US201213448951 | 17.04.2012 | US201213449105 | 17.04.2012 | US201213449056 | 17.04.2012 | US201213448882 | 17.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2833267 | 18.08.2015 | C | CA2833267 | 01.11.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113095983 | 28.04.2011 | WO2012US33892 | 17.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2842639 | 07.04.2015 | C | CA2842639 | 03.07.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213454490 | 24.04.2012 | US201213454913 | 24.04.2012 | US201113095983 | 28.04.2011 | US201213454716 | 24.04.2012 | US201213454670 | 24.04.2012 | US201213454876 | 24.04.2012 | US201213454833 | 24.04.2012 | CA2817043 | 27.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2868647 | 25.08.2015 | C | CA2868647 | 03.07.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213454490 | 24.04.2012 | US201213454913 | 24.04.2012 | US201113095983 | 28.04.2011 | US201213454716 | 24.04.2012 | US201213454670 | 24.04.2012 | CA2842639 | 27.04.2012 | US201213454876 | 24.04.2012 | US201213454833 | 24.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK3202254T | 20.07.2020 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP12719210 | 26.04.2012 | US201213449162 | 17.04.2012 | US201113095983 | 28.04.2011 | US201213449173 | 17.04.2012 | US201213449142 | 17.04.2012 | US201213448993 | 17.04.2012 | US201213448951 | 17.04.2012 | US201213449105 | 17.04.2012 | US201213449056 | 17.04.2012 | US201213448882 | 17.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK3202255T | 06.07.2020 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP12719210 | 26.04.2012 | US201213449162 | 17.04.2012 | US201113095983 | 28.04.2011 | US201213449173 | 17.04.2012 | US201213449142 | 17.04.2012 | US201213448993 | 17.04.2012 | US201213448951 | 17.04.2012 | US201213449105 | 17.04.2012 | US201213449056 | 17.04.2012 | US201213448882 | 17.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK3202257T | 13.07.2020 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP12719210 | 26.04.2012 | US201213449162 | 17.04.2012 | US201113095983 | 28.04.2011 | US201213449173 | 17.04.2012 | US201213449142 | 17.04.2012 | US201213448993 | 17.04.2012 | US201213448951 | 17.04.2012 | US201213449105 | 17.04.2012 | US201213449056 | 17.04.2012 | US201213448882 | 17.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK3202259T | 08.02.2021 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP12719210 | 26.04.2012 | US201213449162 | 17.04.2012 | US201113095983 | 28.04.2011 | US201213449173 | 17.04.2012 | US201213449142 | 17.04.2012 | US201213448993 | 17.04.2012 | US201213448951 | 17.04.2012 | US201213449105 | 17.04.2012 | US201213449056 | 17.04.2012 | US201213448882 | 17.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK3214924T | 03.08.2020 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201414534766 | 06.11.2014 | WO2015US57931 | 29.10.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK3222136T | 25.11.2019 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201213454490 | 24.04.2012 | US201213454913 | 24.04.2012 | US201113095983 | 28.04.2011 | US201213454716 | 24.04.2012 | EP12718850 | 26.04.2012 | US201213454670 | 24.04.2012 | US201213454876 | 24.04.2012 | US201213454833 | 24.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK3424307T | 09.05.2022 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201113095983 | 28.04.2011 | EP12716985 | 17.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2017005899 | 27.06.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201414534766 | 06.11.2014 | WO2015US57931 | 29.10.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ731247 | 28.10.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | US201414534766 | 06.11.2014 | WO2015US57931 | 29.10.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2012149099 | Global Dossier | 01.11.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213449162 | 17.04.2012 | US201113095983 | 28.04.2011 | US201213449173 | 17.04.2012 | US201213449142 | 17.04.2012 | US201213448993 | 17.04.2012 | US201213448951 | 17.04.2012 | US201213449105 | 17.04.2012 | US201213449056 | 17.04.2012 | US201213448882 | 17.04.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2775177 | 24.12.2013 | C | CA2775177 | 04.07.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213449162 | 17.04.2012 | US201113095983 | 28.04.2011 | US201213449173 | 17.04.2012 | US201213449142 | 17.04.2012 | US201213448993 | 17.04.2012 | US201213448951 | 17.04.2012 | US201213449105 | 17.04.2012 | US201213449056 | 17.04.2012 | US201213448882 | 17.04.2012 | Type | Earlier application | EP2701494 |