|
15.05.2024 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.04.2024 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.02.2024 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.02.2024 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.02.2024 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.02.2024 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.10.2023 |
Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.10.2023 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.10.2023 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.10.2023 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.10.2023 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
16.10.2023 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
17.03.2023 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.03.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.03.2023 |
Enquiry as to the processing of the file |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.03.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.02.2023 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.02.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.02.2023 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.03.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.03.2022 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.03.2022 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
07.03.2022 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.03.2022 |
Description |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
07.03.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.03.2022 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.11.2021 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.11.2021 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.05.2021 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.05.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.05.2021 |
Enquiry as to the processing of the file |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.05.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.05.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.05.2020 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
04.05.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.05.2020 |
Description |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
04.05.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.2020 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.01.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.01.2020 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.01.2020 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.08.2019 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2019 |
Enquiry as to the processing of the file |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.04.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.04.2018 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
18.04.2018 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
18.04.2018 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.04.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.10.2017 |
Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.09.2017 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.08.2017 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.08.2017 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.08.2017 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.08.2017 |
Information on Search Strategy |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.07.2017 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.05.2017 |
Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.05.2017 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
38 |
|
02.05.2017 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
46 |
|
24.04.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.04.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.04.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.04.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.03.2017 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.03.2017 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.03.2017 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
01.03.2017 |
Description |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
01.03.2017 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.03.2017 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
01.03.2017 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |