Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP3236235
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
29.03.2024 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] |
28.03.2024 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.02.2024 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
09.02.2024 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
09.02.2024 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
15.10.2023 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
13.10.2023 |
Change - inventor |
published on 15.11.2023 [2023/46] |
27.03.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.02.2023 |
Change - applicant |
published on 22.03.2023 [2023/12] |
29.03.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.03.2022 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
06.11.2021 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
30.03.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.05.2020 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
30.03.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.01.2020 |
First examination report |
|
18.01.2020 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
30.03.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.04.2018 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
20.04.2018 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
22.09.2017 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 25.10.2017 [2017/43] |
22.09.2017 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
22.09.2017 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 25.10.2017 [2017/43] |
01.03.2017 |
Change - representative |
|