EP3211677 - SEMICONDUCTOR LIGHT EMITTING DEVICE COMPRISING UNEVEN SUBSTRATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.10.2020 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.11.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.10.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.03.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.03.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 13.07.2022 [2022/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NICHIA CORPORATION 491-100, Oka, Kaminaka-cho Anan-shi Tokushima 774-8601 / JP | [2017/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Niki, Isamu c/o Nichia Corporation 491-100 Oka Kaminaka-cho Anan-shi, Tokushima 774-8601 / JP | 02 /
Yamada, Motokazu c/o Nichia Corporation 491-100 Oka Kaminaka-cho Anan-shi, Tokushima 774-8601 / JP | 03 /
Sano, Masahiko c/o Nichia Corporation 491-100 Oka Kaminaka-cho Anan-shi, Tokushima 774-8601 / JP | 04 /
Shioji, Shuji c/o Nichia Corporation 491-100 Oka Kaminaka-cho Anan-shi, Tokushima 774-8601 / JP | [2019/49] |
Former [2017/35] | 01 /
Niki, Isamu c/o Nichia Corporation 491-100 Oka Kaminaka-cho ANAN-SHI, Tokushima 774-8601 / JP | ||
02 /
Yamada, Motokazu c/o Nichia Corporation 491-100 Oka Kaminaka-cho ANAN-SHI, Tokushima 774-8601 / JP | |||
03 /
Sano, Masahiko c/o Nichia Corporation 491-100 Oka Kaminaka-cho ANAN-SHI, Tokushima 774-8601 / JP | |||
04 /
Shioji, Shuji c/o Nichia Corporation 491-100 Oka Kaminaka-cho ANAN-SHI, Tokushima 774-8601 / JP | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Johannes-Brahms-Platz 1 20355 Hamburg / DE | [2017/35] | Application number, filing date | 17158639.9 | 24.07.2002 | [2017/35] | Priority number, date | JP20010223114 | 24.07.2001 Original published format: JP 2001223114 | JP20020041737 | 19.02.2002 Original published format: JP 2002041737 | JP20020213490 | 23.07.2002 Original published format: JP 2002213490 | [2017/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3211677 | Date: | 30.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3211677 | Date: | 04.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H01L33/00, H01L21/02 | [2017/35] | CPC: |
H01L21/02378 (EP,US);
H01L33/22 (EP,KR,US);
H01L33/16 (US);
H01L21/0254 (EP,US);
H01L21/02647 (EP,US);
H01L33/007 (EP,US);
H01L33/20 (EP,US);
H01L33/26 (US);
H01L33/32 (US);
H01L33/38 (EP);
H01L2933/0083 (EP,US);
H01L33/24 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2018/15] |
Former [2017/35] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | LICHT EMITTIERENDES HALBLEITERBAUELEMENT MIT EINEM UNEBENEN SUBSTRAT | [2017/35] | English: | SEMICONDUCTOR LIGHT EMITTING DEVICE COMPRISING UNEVEN SUBSTRATE | [2017/35] | French: | DISPOSITIF SEMICONDUCTEUR ÉLECTROLUMINESCENT AVEC UN SUBSTRAT IRRÉGULIER | [2017/35] | Examination procedure | 01.03.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.02.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.02.2018 | Examination requested [2018/15] | 22.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 27.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.10.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 22.10.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.10.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02751652.5 / EP1416543 | EP10171100.0 / EP2256832 | Divisional application(s) | EP19211858.6 / EP3654391 | Opposition(s) | 07.09.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 03.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 03.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 03.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 03.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 03.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 03.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 03.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 31.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 11.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 15.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 18 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.12.2019 | CY | 04.12.2019 | CZ | 04.12.2019 | DK | 04.12.2019 | EE | 04.12.2019 | ES | 04.12.2019 | FI | 04.12.2019 | MC | 04.12.2019 | SE | 04.12.2019 | SK | 04.12.2019 | BG | 04.03.2020 | GR | 05.03.2020 | PT | 29.04.2020 | IE | 24.07.2020 | LU | 24.07.2020 | BE | 31.07.2020 | CH | 31.07.2020 | LI | 31.07.2020 | [2022/28] |
Former [2021/37] | AT | 04.12.2019 | |
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
DK | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
MC | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
IE | 24.07.2020 | ||
LU | 24.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AT | 04.12.2019 | |
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
DK | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
MC | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LU | 24.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 04.12.2019 | |
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
DK | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
MC | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LU | 24.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AT | 04.12.2019 | |
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
DK | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
MC | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AT | 04.12.2019 | |
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
DK | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | CZ | 04.12.2019 | |
DK | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | CZ | 04.12.2019 | |
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | CZ | 04.12.2019 | |
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | CZ | 04.12.2019 | |
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/34] | ES | 04.12.2019 | |
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 04.12.2019 | |
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 04.12.2019 | |
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2000331947 (MITSUBISHI CABLE IND LTD) [A] 1-7* paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0038]; figure 4; table 1 *; | [I]WO0141225 (CREE LIGHTING CO [US]) [I] 1-7 * page 10, line 14 - page 15, line 22; figures 3,4 *; | [I]JP2001160539 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [I] 1-7 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0237]; figures 5, 6, 11, 12 * | by applicant | JPH11274568 |