EP3203471 - DECODER FOR GENERATING A FREQUENCY ENHANCED AUDIO SIGNAL, METHOD OF DECODING, ENCODER FOR GENERATING AN ENCODED SIGNAL AND METHOD OF ENCODING USING COMPACT SELECTION SIDE INFORMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.01.2024 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.02.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.09.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.02.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 07.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK, SI | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastr. 27c 80686 München / DE | [2022/16] |
Former [2017/32] | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastraße 27c 80686 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nagel, Frederik Welserstr. 22 90562 Heroldsberg / DE | 02 /
Disch, Sascha Wilhelmstrasse 70 90766 Fürth / DE | 03 /
Niedermeier, Andreas Ungererstr. 80 80805 München / DE | [2017/32] | Representative(s) | Zinkler, Franz, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | [2017/32] | Application number, filing date | 17158737.1 | 28.01.2014 | [2017/32] | Priority number, date | US201361758092P | 29.01.2013 Original published format: US 201361758092 P | [2017/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3203471 | Date: | 09.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3203471 | Date: | 08.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G10L21/0388 | [2017/32] | CPC: |
G10L21/0388 (EP,KR,RU,US);
G10L19/265 (RU,US);
G10L19/002 (RU,US);
G10L25/69 (RU)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/12] |
Former [2017/32] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | DECODIERER ZUR ERZEUGUNG EINES FREQUENZVERBESSERTEN AUDIOSIGNALS, VERFAHREN ZUR DECODIERUNG, CODIERER ZUR ERZEUGUNG EINES CODIERTEN SIGNALS UND VERFAHREN ZUR CODIERUNG ANHAND KOMPAKTER AUSWAHLNEBENINFORMATIONEN | [2017/32] | English: | DECODER FOR GENERATING A FREQUENCY ENHANCED AUDIO SIGNAL, METHOD OF DECODING, ENCODER FOR GENERATING AN ENCODED SIGNAL AND METHOD OF ENCODING USING COMPACT SELECTION SIDE INFORMATION | [2017/32] | French: | DÉCODEUR POUR PRODUIRE UN SIGNAL AUDIO AMÉLIORÉ EN FRÉQUENCE, PROCÉDÉ DE DÉCODAGE, CODEUR POUR PRODUIRE UN SIGNAL CODÉ ET PROCÉDÉ DE CODAGE UTILISANT DES INFORMATIONS AUXILIAIRES DE SÉLECTION COMPACTE | [2017/32] | Examination procedure | 01.03.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.02.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.02.2018 | Examination requested [2018/12] | 19.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.2022 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 28.06.2022 | 28.06.2022 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 02.09.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.01.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 11.01.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.01.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP14701550.7 / EP2951828 | Opposition(s) | 11.12.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.03.2023 | CZ | 08.03.2023 | DK | 08.03.2023 | EE | 08.03.2023 | FI | 08.03.2023 | HR | 08.03.2023 | LT | 08.03.2023 | LV | 08.03.2023 | NL | 08.03.2023 | PL | 08.03.2023 | RO | 08.03.2023 | RS | 08.03.2023 | SE | 08.03.2023 | SI | 08.03.2023 | SK | 08.03.2023 | SM | 08.03.2023 | NO | 08.06.2023 | GR | 09.06.2023 | IS | 08.07.2023 | PT | 10.07.2023 | [2024/10] |
Former [2023/50] | AT | 08.03.2023 | |
CZ | 08.03.2023 | ||
EE | 08.03.2023 | ||
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
PL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RO | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
SK | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
IS | 08.07.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 08.03.2023 | |
CZ | 08.03.2023 | ||
EE | 08.03.2023 | ||
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RO | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 08.03.2023 | |
EE | 08.03.2023 | ||
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | FI | 08.03.2023 | |
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | FI | 08.03.2023 | |
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | FI | 08.03.2023 | |
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | FI | 08.03.2023 | |
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | HR | 08.03.2023 | |
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | LT | 08.03.2023 | |
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | LT | 08.03.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]EP2239732 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]); |