EP3372963 - WEIGHING CELL MONITORING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.07.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.08.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.07.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.02.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bizerba SE & Co. KG Wilhelm-Kraut-Straße 65 72336 Balingen / DE | [2018/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EPPLER, Heinz Justinus-Kerner-Strasse 20 72469 Messstetten / DE | [2018/37] | Representative(s) | Huber, Meik Bizerba SE & Co. KG PF 18/1 Wilhelm-Kraut-Straße 65 72336 Balingen / DE | [2018/37] | Application number, filing date | 17159278.5 | 05.03.2017 | [2018/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3372963 | Date: | 12.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3372963 | Date: | 22.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G01G23/01 | [2018/37] | CPC: |
G01G23/01 (EP);
G01G3/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/13] |
Former [2018/37] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | WÄGEZELLENÜBERWACHUNG | [2018/37] | English: | WEIGHING CELL MONITORING | [2018/37] | French: | SURVEILLANCE DE CELLULE DE PESAGE | [2018/37] | Examination procedure | 14.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/13] | 14.02.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.03.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.07.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.08.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 12.08.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 12.08.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.06.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.03.2017 | AL | 22.09.2021 | AT | 22.09.2021 | CY | 22.09.2021 | CZ | 22.09.2021 | DK | 22.09.2021 | EE | 22.09.2021 | ES | 22.09.2021 | FI | 22.09.2021 | HR | 22.09.2021 | LT | 22.09.2021 | LV | 22.09.2021 | MC | 22.09.2021 | MK | 22.09.2021 | MT | 22.09.2021 | NL | 22.09.2021 | PL | 22.09.2021 | RO | 22.09.2021 | RS | 22.09.2021 | SE | 22.09.2021 | SI | 22.09.2021 | SK | 22.09.2021 | SM | 22.09.2021 | BG | 22.12.2021 | NO | 22.12.2021 | GR | 23.12.2021 | IS | 22.01.2022 | PT | 24.01.2022 | IE | 05.03.2022 | LU | 05.03.2022 | BE | 31.03.2022 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 05.03.2017 | |
AL | 22.09.2021 | ||
AT | 22.09.2021 | ||
CY | 22.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.09.2021 | ||
DK | 22.09.2021 | ||
EE | 22.09.2021 | ||
ES | 22.09.2021 | ||
FI | 22.09.2021 | ||
HR | 22.09.2021 | ||
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LV | 22.09.2021 | ||
MC | 22.09.2021 | ||
MK | 22.09.2021 | ||
NL | 22.09.2021 | ||
PL | 22.09.2021 | ||
RO | 22.09.2021 | ||
RS | 22.09.2021 | ||
SE | 22.09.2021 | ||
SI | 22.09.2021 | ||
SK | 22.09.2021 | ||
SM | 22.09.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
NO | 22.12.2021 | ||
GR | 23.12.2021 | ||
IS | 22.01.2022 | ||
PT | 24.01.2022 | ||
IE | 05.03.2022 | ||
LU | 05.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 05.03.2017 | |
AL | 22.09.2021 | ||
AT | 22.09.2021 | ||
CY | 22.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.09.2021 | ||
DK | 22.09.2021 | ||
EE | 22.09.2021 | ||
ES | 22.09.2021 | ||
FI | 22.09.2021 | ||
HR | 22.09.2021 | ||
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LV | 22.09.2021 | ||
MC | 22.09.2021 | ||
NL | 22.09.2021 | ||
PL | 22.09.2021 | ||
RO | 22.09.2021 | ||
RS | 22.09.2021 | ||
SE | 22.09.2021 | ||
SI | 22.09.2021 | ||
SK | 22.09.2021 | ||
SM | 22.09.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
NO | 22.12.2021 | ||
GR | 23.12.2021 | ||
IS | 22.01.2022 | ||
PT | 24.01.2022 | ||
IE | 05.03.2022 | ||
LU | 05.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 05.03.2017 | |
AL | 22.09.2021 | ||
AT | 22.09.2021 | ||
CY | 22.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.09.2021 | ||
DK | 22.09.2021 | ||
EE | 22.09.2021 | ||
ES | 22.09.2021 | ||
FI | 22.09.2021 | ||
HR | 22.09.2021 | ||
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LV | 22.09.2021 | ||
MC | 22.09.2021 | ||
NL | 22.09.2021 | ||
PL | 22.09.2021 | ||
RO | 22.09.2021 | ||
RS | 22.09.2021 | ||
SE | 22.09.2021 | ||
SI | 22.09.2021 | ||
SK | 22.09.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
NO | 22.12.2021 | ||
GR | 23.12.2021 | ||
IS | 22.01.2022 | ||
PT | 24.01.2022 | ||
IE | 05.03.2022 | ||
LU | 05.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 05.03.2017 | |
AL | 22.09.2021 | ||
AT | 22.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.09.2021 | ||
DK | 22.09.2021 | ||
EE | 22.09.2021 | ||
ES | 22.09.2021 | ||
FI | 22.09.2021 | ||
HR | 22.09.2021 | ||
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LV | 22.09.2021 | ||
MC | 22.09.2021 | ||
NL | 22.09.2021 | ||
PL | 22.09.2021 | ||
RO | 22.09.2021 | ||
RS | 22.09.2021 | ||
SE | 22.09.2021 | ||
SI | 22.09.2021 | ||
SK | 22.09.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
NO | 22.12.2021 | ||
GR | 23.12.2021 | ||
IS | 22.01.2022 | ||
PT | 24.01.2022 | ||
IE | 05.03.2022 | ||
LU | 05.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 22.09.2021 | |
AT | 22.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.09.2021 | ||
DK | 22.09.2021 | ||
EE | 22.09.2021 | ||
ES | 22.09.2021 | ||
FI | 22.09.2021 | ||
HR | 22.09.2021 | ||
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LV | 22.09.2021 | ||
MC | 22.09.2021 | ||
NL | 22.09.2021 | ||
PL | 22.09.2021 | ||
RO | 22.09.2021 | ||
RS | 22.09.2021 | ||
SE | 22.09.2021 | ||
SI | 22.09.2021 | ||
SK | 22.09.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
NO | 22.12.2021 | ||
GR | 23.12.2021 | ||
IS | 22.01.2022 | ||
PT | 24.01.2022 | ||
IE | 05.03.2022 | ||
LU | 05.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 22.09.2021 | |
AT | 22.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.09.2021 | ||
DK | 22.09.2021 | ||
EE | 22.09.2021 | ||
ES | 22.09.2021 | ||
FI | 22.09.2021 | ||
HR | 22.09.2021 | ||
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LV | 22.09.2021 | ||
MC | 22.09.2021 | ||
NL | 22.09.2021 | ||
PL | 22.09.2021 | ||
RO | 22.09.2021 | ||
RS | 22.09.2021 | ||
SE | 22.09.2021 | ||
SI | 22.09.2021 | ||
SK | 22.09.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
NO | 22.12.2021 | ||
GR | 23.12.2021 | ||
IS | 22.01.2022 | ||
PT | 24.01.2022 | ||
IE | 05.03.2022 | ||
LU | 05.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 22.09.2021 | |
AT | 22.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.09.2021 | ||
DK | 22.09.2021 | ||
EE | 22.09.2021 | ||
ES | 22.09.2021 | ||
FI | 22.09.2021 | ||
HR | 22.09.2021 | ||
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LV | 22.09.2021 | ||
MC | 22.09.2021 | ||
NL | 22.09.2021 | ||
PL | 22.09.2021 | ||
RO | 22.09.2021 | ||
RS | 22.09.2021 | ||
SE | 22.09.2021 | ||
SI | 22.09.2021 | ||
SK | 22.09.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
NO | 22.12.2021 | ||
GR | 23.12.2021 | ||
IS | 22.01.2022 | ||
PT | 24.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AL | 22.09.2021 | |
AT | 22.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.09.2021 | ||
DK | 22.09.2021 | ||
EE | 22.09.2021 | ||
ES | 22.09.2021 | ||
FI | 22.09.2021 | ||
HR | 22.09.2021 | ||
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LV | 22.09.2021 | ||
MC | 22.09.2021 | ||
NL | 22.09.2021 | ||
PL | 22.09.2021 | ||
RO | 22.09.2021 | ||
RS | 22.09.2021 | ||
SE | 22.09.2021 | ||
SK | 22.09.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
NO | 22.12.2021 | ||
GR | 23.12.2021 | ||
IS | 22.01.2022 | ||
PT | 24.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 22.09.2021 | |
AT | 22.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.09.2021 | ||
DK | 22.09.2021 | ||
EE | 22.09.2021 | ||
ES | 22.09.2021 | ||
FI | 22.09.2021 | ||
HR | 22.09.2021 | ||
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LV | 22.09.2021 | ||
NL | 22.09.2021 | ||
PL | 22.09.2021 | ||
RO | 22.09.2021 | ||
RS | 22.09.2021 | ||
SE | 22.09.2021 | ||
SK | 22.09.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
NO | 22.12.2021 | ||
GR | 23.12.2021 | ||
IS | 22.01.2022 | ||
PT | 24.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 22.09.2021 | |
AT | 22.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.09.2021 | ||
EE | 22.09.2021 | ||
ES | 22.09.2021 | ||
FI | 22.09.2021 | ||
HR | 22.09.2021 | ||
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LV | 22.09.2021 | ||
NL | 22.09.2021 | ||
PL | 22.09.2021 | ||
RO | 22.09.2021 | ||
RS | 22.09.2021 | ||
SE | 22.09.2021 | ||
SK | 22.09.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
NO | 22.12.2021 | ||
GR | 23.12.2021 | ||
IS | 22.01.2022 | ||
PT | 24.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 22.09.2021 | |
CZ | 22.09.2021 | ||
EE | 22.09.2021 | ||
ES | 22.09.2021 | ||
FI | 22.09.2021 | ||
HR | 22.09.2021 | ||
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LV | 22.09.2021 | ||
NL | 22.09.2021 | ||
PL | 22.09.2021 | ||
RO | 22.09.2021 | ||
RS | 22.09.2021 | ||
SE | 22.09.2021 | ||
SK | 22.09.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
NO | 22.12.2021 | ||
GR | 23.12.2021 | ||
IS | 22.01.2022 | ||
PT | 24.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 22.09.2021 | |
CZ | 22.09.2021 | ||
EE | 22.09.2021 | ||
ES | 22.09.2021 | ||
FI | 22.09.2021 | ||
HR | 22.09.2021 | ||
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LV | 22.09.2021 | ||
PL | 22.09.2021 | ||
RS | 22.09.2021 | ||
SE | 22.09.2021 | ||
SK | 22.09.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
NO | 22.12.2021 | ||
GR | 23.12.2021 | ||
PT | 24.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 22.09.2021 | |
FI | 22.09.2021 | ||
HR | 22.09.2021 | ||
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LV | 22.09.2021 | ||
RS | 22.09.2021 | ||
SE | 22.09.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
NO | 22.12.2021 | ||
GR | 23.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | FI | 22.09.2021 | |
HR | 22.09.2021 | ||
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LV | 22.09.2021 | ||
RS | 22.09.2021 | ||
SE | 22.09.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
NO | 22.12.2021 | ||
GR | 23.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | FI | 22.09.2021 | |
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
RS | 22.09.2021 | ||
SE | 22.09.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
NO | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | FI | 22.09.2021 | |
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
SE | 22.09.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
NO | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | LT | 22.09.2021 | |
NO | 22.12.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2002066602 (BLISS DOUG [US], et al) [I] 1-16 * abstract * * paragraphs [0018] , [0022] - [0024] - [0 35] , [0 39] , [0 74] , [0 79] , [0081] *; | [I]US2014163909 (SRINIVASAN SIVASUBRAMANIAN [IN], et al) [I] 1-16 * abstract ** paragraph [0043] * | by applicant | EP2037237 |